Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74076
Short Caption:ANDERSON (ARNOLD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72102, 73351, 74736
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C319021Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/20/2019 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:02/20/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/27/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-32893
10/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Although the district court currently retains jurisdiction, upon the entry of the judgment of conviction, appellate jurisdiction will be vested in this court. Upon entry of the judgment of conviction, the clerk of the district court shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment to the clerk of this court.17-36980
12/11/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of the Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial) filed in District Court on December 5, 2017.17-42496
12/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Minutes.17-42880
12/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Transcript Request Form due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.17-44221
12/22/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/14/17. To Court Reporter: Patti Slattery.17-44411
12/22/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/31/16. To Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt.17-44412
12/26/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 01/19/17, 01/24/17, 01/31/17, 03/07/17, 03/16/17, 03/23/17, 04/13/17, 05/04/17, 05/25/17, 06/13/17, 07/25/17, 08/22/17, 08/29/17, 08/30/17, 08/31/17, 09/01/17, 10/24/17, 10/31/17, 11/30/17, 12/07/17. To Court Reporter: Kristine Santi17-44416
12/26/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/01/16, 12/06/16, 12/13/16, 12/22/16. To Court Reporter: Kristine Cornelius.17-44417
12/26/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/07/16, 09/13/16, 09/21/16, 10/05/16, 10/12/16. To Court Reporter: Robert Cangemi.17-44418
12/26/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-44470
01/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Administratively Closing Appeal and Transferring Documents. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 74736 and transfer to Docket No. 74076 all documents filed or received in Docket No. 74736. Nos. 74076/74736.18-01309
01/10/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (TRANSFERRED FROM DOCKET NO. 74736 PER ORDER 1/10/18).18-01313
02/09/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice Of Non-Preparation Of Transcripts.18-05515
02/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts and Denying Motion for Extension of Time. Kristine Santi's Court Reporter Certificate due: 20 days. Although the notice filed by appellant does not comply with the requirements for a motion for an extension of time, we elect to construe the notice as such. The motion id denied at this time. Appellant may renew the motion as the deadline for filing the opening brief and appendix approaches, if deemed necessary.18-05810
02/13/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/31/16.18-05955
02/16/2018MotionFiled Court Recorder Kristine Santi's Affidavit & Motion for Extension for Transcripts.18-06561
02/16/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/28/17, 8/29/17, 8/30/17, 9/1/17, 8/31/17.18-06574
02/16/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristine Santi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/1/16, 12/6/16, 12/13/16, 12/22/16, 1/19/17, 1/24/17, 1/31/17, 3/7/17, 3/16/17, 3/23/17, 4/13/17, 5/4/17, 5/25/17, 6/13/17, 7/25/17, 8/22/17, 10/24/17, 10/31/17, 11/30/17, 12/7/17, 11/14/17.18-06575
02/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court recorder Kristine Santi has filed a motion for an extension of time to file the certificate required by NRAP 9(c)(2). The certificates were inadvertently filed on February 16, 2018. Accordingly, we take no action on the motion.18-07669
04/23/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-15435
04/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-8.18-15438
05/23/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report.18-19759
05/23/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (PORTIONS STRICKEN PER 06/21/18 ORDER).18-23744
05/24/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition To Motion To Transmit Presentence Investigation Report.18-20022
06/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion to Transmit Presentence Investigation Report and Striking Answering Brief. Respondent has filed a motion to transmit the presentence investigation report. Respondent does not demonstrate that this court's review of the PSI is necessary. Because we deny the motion to transmit the PSI, we also strike the portion of the answering brief that relies on that document. The clerk of this court shall strike the portion of the answering brief beginning on page 4 with the words "The facts relevant" and ending on page 5 with the phrase "November 7, 2017, at 6."18-23741
06/21/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: July 6, 2018.18-23811
07/02/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-24941
07/02/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, February 20, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-00593
01/14/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel for Oral Argument (Lisa A. Rasmussen for Appellant). (SC)19-02032
02/06/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-05717
02/20/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel JH/LS/AS. (SC)
09/05/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 37. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC) (OPINION WITHDRAWN PER 10/31/19 ORDER).19-37064
09/09/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition For Rehearing/Request For En Banc Consideration. (SC)Y19-37644
10/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Withdrawing Opinion. On September 5, 2019, an authored opinion by Justice Stiglich was filed in this case, with Justices Hardesty and Silver concurring. Justice Silver's separately written concurrence inadvertently did not get filed with the opinion, however. Accordingly, we direct the clerk of this court to withdraw the prior opinion from publication. A substitute opinion will be issued in its place. (SC).19-44843