Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74163
Short Caption:VEGAS UNITED INV. SERIES 105, INC. VS. CELTIC BANK CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A728233Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/13/2017 / Singer, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/23/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/09/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
10/09/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-34267
10/09/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-34269
10/10/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Roger P. Croteau & Associates, Ltd. Check no. 21799.
10/10/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-34469
10/13/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael H. Singer.17-35011
10/17/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-35577
11/14/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency NRAP 8 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal.17-39241
11/15/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.17-39262
11/15/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy (Appellant's Emergency NRAP 8 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal).17-39351
11/16/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) NRAP 8 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal.17-39591
11/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Injunction. We deny appellant's motion.17-39766
12/06/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 17, 2018, at 10:00 am.17-42075
01/23/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-03206
01/24/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Amended Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-03336
02/12/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix. Appellant's counsel shall personally pay the sum of $1,304.37 to respondent to partially offset the attorney's fees and costs incurred by respondent in attending the scheduled mediation. Counsel for appellant shall file proof of payment with this court within 15 days from the date of this order.18-05625
02/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended.18-07132
03/26/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause (Request for Extension).18-11510
04/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Imposing Additional Sanctions. We conclude that counsel's failure to file the proof of payment in compliance with this court's order warrants the imposition of additional monetary sanctions. Accordingly, attorneys Roger P. Croteau and Timothy E. Rhoda shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, each pay the sum of $250 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment, as well as proof of payment of the $1,304.37.18-13190
04/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 45 days from the date of this order to submit documentation that demonstrates this court's jurisdiction. Failure to demonstrate jurisdiction will result in dismissal of this appeal. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days of service of appellant's response.18-13204
04/11/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Sanction Payments. Check No. 21959 in the amount of $1304.32 from Roger Croteau & Associates paid to Sylvester & Polednak on March 12, 2018. Check No. 22007 in the amount of $250.00 from Roger Croteau & Associates paid to the Supreme Court Law Library on 4/10/18.18-13818
05/08/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Supplement to Response to Order to Show Cause.18-17537
05/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with NRAP 9(a). Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days.18-20313
06/14/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/09/17, 08/10/17, 08/11/17. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez.18-22823
08/28/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (First Request).18-33523
09/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 11, 2018.18-34695
10/11/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request).18-39962
10/11/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix (Second Request).18-40007
10/17/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 15 days.18-40885
11/02/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-43042
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-43045
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.18-43046
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.18-43047
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.18-43048
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5.18-43050
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix MASTER INDEX.18-43144
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6.18-43145
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7.18-43148
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8.18-43149
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 9.18-43150
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 10.18-43151
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 11.18-43166
11/02/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 12.18-43167
11/05/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/09/17, 08/10/17 and 08/11/17. (SC)18-902744
11/19/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) - NRAP 8 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. (SC)18-904677
11/19/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Receipt of Copy (Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e)). (SC)18-904814
11/20/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) NRAP 8 Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. (SC)18-904899
11/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Injunction. Appellant has filed a motion seeking to enjoin respondent, pending resolution of this appeal, from selling property it acquired after a judicially approved foreclosure sale. Appellant seeks relief before the potential one-year redemption period expires on November 21, 2018, and thus filed the motion on an emergency basis under NRAP 27 (e). We deny appellant's motion. (SC).18-905197
12/03/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Respondent's Answering brief due: 5 days.18-906629
12/03/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-906673
01/04/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-00457
01/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: February 19, 2019. (SC)19-01776
02/20/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-07923
02/20/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/20/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)19-26655
06/20/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Errata to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)19-26685
06/27/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC)19-27823
07/02/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (SC).19-28390
07/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-31102
08/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to dismiss the appeal as moot because the subject property has been sold to a third party. This court denies the motion. (SC).19-34504
12/19/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Hardesty, Stiglich and Silver, JJ. Author: Stiglich, J. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 61. SNP19. (SC).19-51313
01/13/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-01422
01/13/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/31/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 16, 2020. (SC)20-01422