Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74169
Short Caption:STATE VS. PLUNKETT (ALEXIS)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C324821Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/09/2018 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:07/09/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/10/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
10/10/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Filed certified copy of notice of appeal.17-34379
10/11/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 30 days.17-34679
11/03/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 11/01/17. Finding of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order (Defendant's Proposed Order).17-37749
11/28/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Order. Filed in district court on: 10/31/2017.17-40888
11/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Request for Rough Draft Transcripts due: 11 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days.17-41288
12/06/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-41974
01/22/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.18-02775
01/22/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement.18-02879
02/13/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: February 20, 2018.18-05807
02/22/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.18-06821
03/07/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Reply to Fast Track Response.18-08998
03/07/2018Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
05/17/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-18962
05/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, July 9, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-20224
06/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-24482
07/09/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
11/15/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 88. EN BANC (SC)18-904230
12/11/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)18-907979
12/11/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)