Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74184
Short Caption:WYNN VS. DIST. CT. (WYNN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/02/2018 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:01/02/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/11/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Daniel F. Polsenberg.
10/11/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.17-34628
10/11/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.17-34629
10/11/2017MotionFiled Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Writ Petition and to File Under Seal Portions of Appendix.17-34630
10/12/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(e) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay.17-34723
10/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay And Directing Answer. We enter a temporary stay of the district court's September 25, 2017, oral ruling denying petitioner work-product protection and compelling production of the notes. Within 5 days from the date of this order, real parties in interest shall file and serve a response to the motion. Petitioner shall have 3 days from service of the response to file and serve any reply. Petitioner has also moved for leave to file a redacted petition, and to file an unredacted copy of the petition and volume 2 of the appendix under seal. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted copy of the petition and volume 2 of the appendix, both provisionally received in this court on October 13, 2017. Additionally, it appears that an answer to the writ petition will assist this court in resolving this matter. Answer due: 15 days. Petitioner's Reply due: 5 days from service of answer. fn1[Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order to supplement the appendix with a copy of the district court's written order reflecting the challenged ruling.]17-35385
10/16/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition (SEALED).
10/16/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ Volume 2 (SEALED).
10/24/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Stay of Production.17-36487
11/01/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Supplemental Appendix due: November 14, 2017.17-37347
11/01/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest The Wynn Parties Answer to Elaine P. Wynn's Petition for Writ of Prohibition (Redacted).17-37358
11/01/2017MotionFiled The Wynn Parties' Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Answer to Writ Petition and to File Their Appendix Under Seal.17-37359
11/03/2017AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix Volume 3.17-37808
11/07/2017MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Reply Brief.17-38120
11/13/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Motion to Strike and to File Under Seal Supporting Declaration. (DEATCHED REDACTED VERSION OF THE MOTION TO STRIKE AND FILED SEPARATELY.)17-38985
11/21/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Reply.17-40151
11/21/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Wynn Parties' Response to Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Motion to Strike and to Seal Supporting Decl. and Countermotion to Redact and Seal Portions of Response and to Seal Supporting Exhibit. (DETACHED RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND FILED PER 12/5/17 ORDER.)17-40299
11/27/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled for January 2, 2017, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.17-40953
11/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Corrected Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is hereby scheduled for January 2, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.17-41005
11/30/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/30/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Reply Brief on Motion to Strike Appendix. (DETACHED REDACTED REPLY BRIEF ON MOTION TO STRIKE APPENDIX AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 12/5/17 ORDER.)17-41325
12/05/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court's October 31, 2017, order denying petitioner work-product protection and compelling production of the notes shall be stayed pending further order of this court. Real parties in interest have filed a motion to file a redacted version of their answer to the petition for a writ of prohibition and to file an unredacted version under seal, and to file their appendix under seal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. The redacted answer was inadvertently filed on November 1, 2017. Real parties shall have 11 days from the date of this order to submit the unredacted answer and the appendix. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the unredacted answer and the appendix under seal. The clerk of this court shall file the redacted reply received via E-Flex on November 21, 2017. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted reply received on November 29, 2017. The clerk of this court shall detach the redacted version of the motion to strike portions of the appendix from the motion filed on November 13, 2017, and shall file it separately. The clerk shall file the unredacted version of the motion to strike received on November 14, 2017, under seal. The clerk shall detach the redacted version of real parties' response to petitioner's motion to strike portions of their appendix, attached to the response as Exhibit A to the response to the motion to redact and seal filed on November 21, 2017, and shall file it separately. Real parties shall have 5 days from the date of this order to submit the unredacted version of their response to the motion to strike portions of the appendix and their supporting exhibit. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the response and exhibit under seal. The clerk of this court shall detach the redacted version of the reply brief on motion to strike appendix from the motion to redact filed on November 30, 2017, and shall file it separately. The clerk shall file the reply brief on motion to strike appendix received on December 5, 2017, under seal.17-41866
12/05/2017Petition/WritFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Reply.17-41869
12/05/2017MotionFiled Motion to Strike Appendix (Redacted version).17-41878
12/05/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion to Strike Appendix (SEALED).
12/05/2017MotionFiled The Wynn Parties' Response to Elaine P. Wynn's Motion to Strike Appendix (Redacted version).17-41886
12/05/2017MotionFiled Reply Brief on Motion to Strike Appendix (Redacted version).17-41893
12/05/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply Brief on Motion to Strike Appendix.
12/05/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner Elaine P. Wynn's Reply to Answer to Petition (SEALED).
12/07/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest The Wynn Parties' Answer to Elaine P. Wynn's Petition for Writ of Prohibition (SEALED).
12/07/2017AppendixFiled Real Party in Interest The Wynn Parties' Appendix (SEALED).
12/07/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest The Wynn Parties' Response to Elaine P. Wynn's Motion to Strike Appendix (SEALED).
12/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner has filed a motion to strike portions of real parties in interest's answer against issuance of the writ and the supporting appendix. We deny the motion.17-42724
12/14/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest The Wynn Parties' Motion to Seal Supplemental Appendix.17-43220
12/14/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Supplement to The Wynn Parties' Appendix and Updated Citations to Record.17-43221
12/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-43830
12/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion of real parties in interest to seal the supplemental appendix is granted. Supplemental Appendix due: 11 days. Upon receipt, the clerk of this court shall file the supplement under seal.17-43903
12/22/2017AppendixFiled The Wynn Parties' Supplemental Appendix (SEALED).
01/02/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
01/11/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. "The petition is thus denied." En Banc.18-01739
02/05/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-04816
02/05/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.