Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74266
Short Caption:STATE ENGINEER VS. HAPPY CREEK, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV 20,869Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:02/05/2019 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/05/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - State/County/Municipality.
10/20/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-36054
10/20/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-36056
10/23/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:17-36144
10/25/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/14/17. To Court Reporter: Deborah Hines.17-36729
11/07/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Debbie Hines stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: None listed.17-38255
11/08/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-38433
02/16/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 6, 2018.18-06473
03/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-08881
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Joint Appendix - Vols. 1 thru 4.18-08882
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Joint Appendix - Vols. 5 thru 8.18-08887
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Joint Appendix - Vols. 9 thru 12.18-08888
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Joint Appendix - Vols. 13 thru 16.18-08889
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Joint Appendix - Vol. 1718-08890
04/02/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: April 19, 2018.18-12500
04/20/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering brief.18-15271
05/11/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Change of Attorney for Appellant State Engineer. Deputy Attorney General James N. Bolotin appearing in place of Justina A. Caviglia.18-18169
05/21/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-19384
05/21/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, February 5, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. (SC)19-00589
01/18/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Appellant Jason King, Nevada State Engineer. (SC)19-02962
01/22/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Substitution. Pursuant to the notice of substitution filed on January 18, 2019, Tim Wilson, P.E., is substituted in this matter in place of Jason King P.E., as Nevada State Engineer. The clerk shall amend the caption accordingly. (SC).19-03330
01/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-03393
01/31/2019BriefFiled Respondent Happy Creek, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority (NRAP 31(e)). (SC)19-04824
02/01/2019BriefFiled Appellant State Engineer's Response to Respondent Happy Creek, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority (NRAP 31(e)). (SC)19-05168
02/05/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
09/12/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish/Silver. Hardesty, J., with whom Stiglich, J., agrees dissenting. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 41. EN BANC (SC)19-38083