Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74275
Short Caption:YOUNT VS. CRISWELL RADOVAN, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):77987
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1600767Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:10/26/2017 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/24/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. Check no. 177709 from Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie.
10/24/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-36595
10/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-36740
10/26/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg.17-36886
11/08/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 15, 2017, at 10:00 am.17-38484
11/15/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Docketing Statement due: November 28, 2017.17-39332
11/29/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-41006
12/15/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March of 2018.17-43467
03/26/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: April 24, 2018, at 9:00 am.18-11595
03/29/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.18-12164
05/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys (Mark Simons to replace Andrew Wolf as counsel for the Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate LLC).18-17009
05/10/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-17913
05/11/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-18091
05/30/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: June 12, 2018.18-20420
06/13/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Request for Transcripts.18-22552
06/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: July 12, 2018.18-24142
07/12/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Request for Transcripts.18-26679
08/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the request for transcripts; appellant shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.18-29640
08/09/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Determine Appellate Jurisdiction.18-30755
08/24/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for this court to determine its jurisdiction over this appeal. The appeal was properly taken from the amended order. Appellant's transcript request due: 15 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.18-33097
09/11/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-35329
10/05/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address and Law Firm (Richard G. Campbell, Jr.).18-39191
10/24/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix.18-41768
11/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 22, 2019.18-42903
01/23/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (SC).19-03429
03/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on February 21, 2019. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief(s). (SC)19-09758
03/05/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-09764
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. (SC)19-09765
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. (SC)19-09766
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. (SC)19-09767
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. (SC)19-09768
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5. (SC)19-09769
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6. (SC)19-09772
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7. (SC)19-09773
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8. (SC)19-09774
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9. (SC)19-09776
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10. (SC)19-09777
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11. (SC)19-09778
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12. (SC)19-09780
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13. (SC)19-09781
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14. (SC)19-09782
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15. (SC)19-09783
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16. (SC)19-09784
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 17. (SC)19-09785
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 18. (SC)19-09786
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 19. (SC)19-09795
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 20. (SC)19-09787
03/05/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 21. (SC)19-09788
03/21/2019MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Briefs. (SC)19-12679
03/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondents' Answering Briefs due: June 3, 2019. (SC).19-13698
05/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Firm Name Change. (SC)19-22403
06/03/2019BriefFiled Respondents David Marriner's and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Answering Brief (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON JUNE 4, 2019). (SC)
06/03/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief (Second Request). (SC)19-24389
06/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondents David Marriner's and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)19-24258
06/05/2019BriefFiled Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)19-24320
06/05/2019AppendixFiled Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Appendix Vol. 1. (SC)19-24322
06/05/2019AppendixFiled Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Appendix Vol. 2. (SC)19-24323
06/05/2019AppendixFiled Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Appendix Vol. 3. (SC)19-24324
07/03/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC, CR Cal Neva, LLC; Robert Radovan; William Criswell; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP shall have until July 10, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. (SC)19-28462
07/11/2019BriefFiled Respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC; CR Cal Neva, LLC, Robert Radovan; William Criswell; Cal Neva Lodge, LLC; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED JULY 11, 2019). (SC)
07/11/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)19-29602
07/11/2019MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC)19-29649
07/11/2019BriefFiled Respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC; CR Cal Neva, LLC, Robert Radovan; William Criswell; Cal Neva Lodge, LLC; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP's Answering Brief. (SC)19-29650
07/11/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-29651
07/22/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The motion for extensions of time filed on July 11, 2019, are granted. the answering brief of respondents Criswell Radovan, LLC; CR Cal Neva, LLC, Robert Radovan; William Criswell; Cal Neva Lodge, LLC; and Powell, Coleman and Arnold, LLP, was filed on July 11, 2019. Appellant's Reply Brief due: 30 days. (SC).19-30797
08/21/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File the Reply Brief. (SC)19-35143
08/27/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 20, 2019. (SC)19-35757
09/20/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File the Reply Brief. (SC)19-39409
09/24/2019MotionFiled Respondents David Marriner and Marriner Real Estate, LLC's Opposition to Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-39731
10/01/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of "Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief."19-40849
10/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: October 21, 2019. (SC)19-42838
10/21/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-43582
10/22/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
07/30/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish.136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 47. En Banc. (SC).20-27719