Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 74326
Short Caption:OKADA VS. DIST. CT. (WYNN RESORTS, LTD.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/04/2017 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:12/04/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/02/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Steve L. Morris.
11/02/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or in the Alternative Mandamus.17-37602
11/02/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
11/02/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
11/02/2017MotionFiled Motion to File Portions of Petitioners' Appendix Under Seal.17-37605
11/02/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.17-37608
11/02/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2. (Redacted).17-37609
11/15/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the unredacted portion of the appendix received on November 7, 2017, under seal.17-39335
11/15/2017AppendixFiled SEALED - Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2 (SEALED).
11/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Expedited Answer. Answer due: December 1, 2017. No extensions of time will be granted. Fn1[ All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court.17-40949
11/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 4, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.17-40950
11/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-41064
11/30/2017MotionFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Emergency Motion to Intervene and Join in the Petition.17-41246
11/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to Intervene. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption to add Elaine P. Wynn as a petitioner in these proceedings.17-41312
12/01/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative, Mandamus.17-41404
12/01/2017AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Parties in Interest Wynn Resorts, Limited and Robert J. Miller's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or in the Alternative, Mandamus.17-41405
12/04/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
01/11/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus directing the district court to set aside the order denying the motion to compel testimony and documents relating to communications with the Nevada Gaming Control Board on the basis that the information was protected by NRS 463.120(6). Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 2. EN BANC18-01501
01/11/2018WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and two copies of writ and two copies of the opinion mailed to Attorney Steve Morris for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.18-01736
01/19/2018WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on January 11, 2018.18-02685
01/30/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Letter in Compliance with the January 11, 2018 Order.18-04054
02/05/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-04810
02/05/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.