Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74335
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF BUS. AND INDUS. VS. TITLEMAX OF NEV., INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A743134Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/06/2017 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/04/2019 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/04/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/03/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
11/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-37735
11/03/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-37737
11/06/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.17-38023
11/13/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/03/17. To Court Reporter: Matt Yarbrough.17-38851
11/22/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-40376
12/11/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for January 24, 2018, at 10:00 am.17-42503
12/14/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Matthew Yarbrough stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 08/03/17.17-43152
01/29/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-03962
01/31/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 45 days.18-04227
03/08/2018MotionFiled Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time (Opening Brief and Appendix).18-09115
03/08/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 18, 2018.18-09117
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 1.18-14927
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 2.18-14928
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 3.18-14929
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 4.18-14930
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 5.18-14932
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 6.18-14933
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 7.18-14935
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 8.18-14936
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 9.18-14948
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 10.18-14950
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 11.18-14952
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 12.18-14953
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 13.18-14954
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 14.18-14955
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 15.18-14957
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 16.18-14959
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 17.18-14961
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 18.18-14962
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 19.18-14965
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 20.18-14966
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 21.18-14968
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 22.18-14970
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 23.18-14972
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 24.18-14974
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 25.18-14975
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 26.18-14979
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 27.18-14980
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 28.18-14981
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 29.18-14984
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 30.18-14987
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 31.18-14989
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 32.18-14990
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 33.18-14992
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 34.18-14994
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 35.18-14996
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 36.18-14997
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 37.18-14998
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 38.18-14999
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 39.18-15000
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 40.18-15001
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 41.18-15003
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 42.18-15006
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 43 part 1.18-15007
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 43 Part 2.18-15188
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 44.18-15008
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 45.18-15010
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 46.18-15012
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 47.18-15015
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 48.18-15019
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 49.18-15028
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 50.18-15039
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 51.18-15045
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 52.18-15054
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 53.18-15060
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 54.18-15061
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 55.18-15063
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 56.18-15064
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 57.18-15065
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 58.18-15067
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 59.18-15068
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 60.18-15070
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 61.18-15072
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 62.18-15074
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 63.18-15075
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 64.18-15076
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 65.18-15097
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 66.18-15098
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 67.18-15099
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 68.18-15101
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 69.18-15102
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 70.18-15103
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 71.18-15104
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 72.18-15105
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 73.18-15107
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 74.18-15108
04/19/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 75.18-15110
04/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief due: 5 days.18-15136
04/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-15272
04/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief.18-15371
05/18/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief.18-19179
05/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: June 20, 2018.18-19184
06/21/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.18-23661
06/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: July 20, 2018.18-24639
07/23/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-27887
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 1 Part 1.18-27889
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 1 Part 2.18-27890
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 1 Part 3.18-27891
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 1 Part 4.18-27895
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 2 Part 1.18-27897
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 2 Part 2.18-27899
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 2 Part 3.18-27900
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 2 Part 4.18-27902
07/23/2018AppendixFiled Answering Brief Appendix Volume 3 Part 1.18-27903
08/17/2018MotionFiled Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time (Reply Brief).18-31894
08/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: September 21, 2018.18-31897
09/21/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-37044
09/21/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
10/29/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Patrick J. Reilly of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP.18-42404
01/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, March 4, 2019, at 3:00 p.m. for 30 min. in Carson City. (SC)19-04422
02/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-07483
02/19/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Heidi Parry Stern as counsel for Appellant). (SC)19-07653
03/01/2019MotionFiled Riley Snyder of The Nevada Independent/Las Vegas requesting a still camera photographer in the courtroom. (Via Fax). (SC)19-09367
03/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Riley Snyder of The Nevada Independent is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 2:30 p.m. (SC)19-09453
03/04/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court (SC).