Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74449
Short Caption:STARK VS. LACKEYCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74461
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1700434Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:11/16/2017 / Shipman, MadelynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:10/08/2019 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:William S. Boyd School of Law - UNLV
Submission Date:10/08/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/14/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Winter Street Law Group. Check no. 5754.
11/14/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-39218
11/14/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-39220
11/16/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman.17-39556
12/04/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-41643
12/04/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 20, 2017, at 9:00 am.17-41670
12/27/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-44692
01/02/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-00131
01/05/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-00754
03/27/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 16, 2018.18-11744
04/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. I.18-14470
04/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. II.18-14471
04/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. III.18-14472
04/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. IV.18-14473
04/16/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-14526
05/16/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-18604
06/18/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-23103
06/18/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/23/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. These appeals will be scheduled for oral argument together on October 8, 209, at 10:30 a.m. at the Thomas and Mack Moot Court Facility on the campus of the William S. Boyd School of Law in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 60 minutes. Nos. 74449 and 74461. (SC)19-35332
08/27/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Respondent's Association of Counsel (Travis Gerber and Zachary Gerber of Gerber Law Offices are hereby associated as counsel of record into this action on behalf of Respondent). Nos. 74449/74461 (SC)19-35846
08/27/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Respondent's Association of Counsel (DUPLICATE FILING). (SC)19-35848
09/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos 74449/74461 (SC)19-40226
10/08/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
02/27/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 4. EN BANC (SC)20-07835
03/23/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-11058
03/23/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)