Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 74468
Short Caption:VALENTINE (KEANDRE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C316081Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/19/2019 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:07/19/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/16/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
11/16/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-39518
12/01/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/29/16, 07/07/16, 09/01/16, 10/04/16, 02/16/17, 02/21/17, 06/06/17, 07/20/17, 07/21/17, 07/24/17, 07/25/17, 07/26/17, 07/27/17, 07/28/17, 07/31/17, 08/01/17, 08/02/17, 08/03/17, 08/04/17, 09/28/17. To Court Reporter: Cynthia Georgilas, Sara Richardson, Sandra Pruchnic, Jill Hawkins, Dalyne Easley.17-41514
12/06/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-41973
12/11/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robin Page stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/29/16.17-42426
12/14/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sara Richardson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/07/16, 09/01/16, 10/04/16, 02/16/17, 02/21/17, 06/06/17, 07/20/17, 07/24/17.17-43313
12/29/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/28/17.17-44952
12/29/2017MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts.17-44963
01/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Recorder Dalyne Easley's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: February 1, 2018.18-00985
01/23/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/21/17.18-03106
02/01/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/24/17, 7/25/17, 7/26/17, 7/27/17, 7/28/17, 7/31/17, 8/1/17, 8/2/17, 8/3/17 and 8/4/17.18-04461
03/16/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.18-10433
03/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 16, 2018.18-10436
04/17/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. (Opening Brief & Appendix).18-14615
04/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 15, 2018.18-15935
06/18/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief Based on Changed Circumstances.18-23071
06/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 30, 2018.18-24637
07/31/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Three Day Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-29333
08/06/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Opening Brief.18-30004
08/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. The clerk shall file the appendix received on August 2, 2018. We grant appellant's motion for leave to file an amended opening brief. The clerk shall reject the opening brief received on August 3, 2018, and file the amended opening brief received on August 6, 2018.18-30469
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol I.18-30471
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II.18-30472
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol III.18-30473
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV.18-30474
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol V.18-30475
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VI.18-30477
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VII.18-30478
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VIII.18-30479
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IX.18-30480
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol X.18-30481
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XI.18-30482
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XII.18-30483
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XIII.18-30492
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XIV.18-30493
08/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XV.18-30484
08/08/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Amended Opening Brief.18-30494
09/07/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answering Brief.18-34946
09/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 6, 2018.18-35830
11/06/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-903115
11/21/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief. (SC)18-905229
11/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 7, 2019. (SC)18-905252
01/08/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-01124
01/08/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
06/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, July 19, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-23987
07/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-28911
07/19/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
07/26/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmittal of the Bioform Attorney's List Pursuant to NRAP 30(d). (SC)19-31733
08/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed an unopposed motion for the transmission of the sealed "Bioform-Attorney's List" kept on the left side of the district court's file. The motion to transmit the document is denied without prejudice. If deemed warranted, appellant may provide this court with a copy of the Bioform along with a motion to file the document under seal. The document will be kept confidential pending resolution of the motion to file it under seal. Any such motion must be filed within 7 days of the date of this order. (SC).19-34143
08/28/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Requesting Court File Bioform - Attorney's List Under Seal Pursuant to August 14, 2019 Order and Motion to Reconsider 7 day Time Limit. (SC)19-35973
08/29/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion Requesting Court File Bioform - Attorney's List Under Seal Pursuant to August 14, 2019 Order and Motion to Reconsider 7 Day Time Limit (SEALED). (DETACHED "BIOFORM-ATTORNEYS LIST" AND FILED SEPARATELY UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 9/4/19). (SC)19-37007
09/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Document under Seal. Appellant's motions for leave to file a "Bioform-Attorney's List" under seal and to reconsider time limit are granted to the following extent. The clerk shall detach the form from the motion filed on August 29, 2019, and file it separately, under seal. (SC)19-37011
09/04/2019Notice/IncomingFiled SEALED Bioform - Attorney's List.
12/19/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Filed Authored Opinion. "Vacated and remanded." Before Hardesty, Stiglich and Silver, JJ. Author: Stiglich, J. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 62. SNP19. (SC).19-51314
01/13/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-01423
01/13/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
01/31/2020RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 16, 2020. (SC)20-01423