Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74500
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/20/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Debra L. Spinelli.
11/20/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively Prohibition.17-39917
11/20/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.17-39918
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 12.17-39919
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 14.17-39920
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 23.17-39923
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 24.17-39924
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 25.17-39925
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 31.17-39926
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 41.17-39927
11/20/2017MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e) Pending Writ Review of October 31, 2017 Order.17-39928
11/20/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Intent to Oppose Wynn Resorts, Limited's Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e) Pending Writ Review of October 31, 2017 Order.17-40120
11/21/2017MotionFiled Petitioner Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Volumes of its Appendix Under Seal and to Redact Portions of its Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively Prohibition.17-40197
11/27/2017MotionFiled Defendants' Opposition to Wynn Resorts Limited's Emergency Motion for stay Under NRAP 27(e) Pending Writ Review of October 31, 2017 Order.17-40499
11/28/2017MotionFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Motion to Intervene to Oppose Stay and Proposed Opposition to Stay of Entire Litigation.17-40728
12/01/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e) Pending Writ Review of October 31, 2017 Order.17-41419
12/04/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[In light of this order, the following pending motions are denied as moot: (1) the November 20, 2017, motion for a stay; (2) the November 21, 2017, motion to file appendices under seal and redact portions of the petition; and (3) the November 28, 2017, motion to intervene. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proposed appendix to petition, provisionally received on November 21, 2017.] EN BANC17-41561
12/29/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-44880
12/29/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.