Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 74517
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 68046, 69737, 71577, 72766, 72897, 73837, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/21/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. In Forma Pauperis.
11/21/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-40226
11/21/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.17-40229
11/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.17-41298
12/04/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-38 (via FTP).17-41529
12/04/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 39-49 (via FTP).17-41543
12/08/2017Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/19/17. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.17-42298
12/08/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 4481-4600, 4601-4782, 4784-4800, 4801-4864, 5824-5853, 7290-7400, 7401-7484, 7519-7526, 7546-7551, 7884-7979, 9037-9041, 9074-9135, 9140-9141, 9243-9302 (SEALED).
12/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Transcripts. We decline to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time.17-42647
12/14/2017Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-43093
03/19/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-10623
05/02/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/20/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-27708
08/14/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-31381
08/14/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/24/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 17, 2018.18-31381