Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74519
Short Caption:QUINN VS. DIST. CT. (SINATRA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:12/04/2017 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:12/04/2017How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/21/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Pat Lundvall.
11/21/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus.17-40249
11/21/2017MotionFiled Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition and Rule 27(E) Emergency Motion for Interim Extension of Stay (Action Required by November 21, 2017).17-40250
11/21/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.17-40252
11/21/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.17-40253
11/21/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.17-40254
11/21/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.17-40255
11/21/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest Elaine P. Wynn's Joinder in Writ Petition by Former Counsel.17-40337
11/22/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Intent to File Supplement to Writ Petition and Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition.17-40479
11/27/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Expedited Answer. Answer due: December 1, 2017. No extensions of time will be granted. Fn1[We defer ruling on the stay motion.] Fn2[ The clerk of this court is directed to modify the caption of this writ proceedings to reflect Elaine Wynn's status as a petitioner, rather than as a real party in interest.] Fn3[ All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court.17-40951
11/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 4, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.17-40952
11/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.17-41065
11/30/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Petitioners' Supplemental Appendix.17-41339
11/30/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Supplement to Writ Petition and Motion to Extend District Court's Stay Pending Writ Petition.17-41340
12/01/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, Alternatively, Mandamus.17-41414
12/01/2017AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Parties in Interest Kimmarie Sinatra and Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume I of II.17-41416
12/01/2017AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Real Parties in Interest Kimmarie Sinatra and Wynn Resorts, Limited's Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume II of II.17-41417
12/04/2017Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
02/08/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of prohibition directing the district court to vacate the order granting the motion to compel dispositions. Fn1[The Honorable Ron D. Parraguirre, Justice, and the Honorable Kristina Pickering, Justice, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] Fn9[In light of our decision, we deny as moot petitioners' motion to extend the district court's stay.]Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 5. EN BANC18-05208
02/08/2018WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and two copies of writ and two copies of opinion mailed to Attorney Pat Lundvall for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez.18-05248
02/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Writ and Opinion served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez).18-05378
02/15/2018WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez on February 8, 2018.18-06283
02/15/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Eighth Judicial District Court in compliance with 2/11/18 order.18-06388
03/05/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-08543
03/05/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.