Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74566
Short Caption:CLARK CTY. SCHOOL DIST. VS. BRYAN C/W 73856Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:73856*, 74566Related Case(s):73856
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A700018Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/18/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
11/30/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-41293
11/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-41303
12/01/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:17-41418
12/07/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 08/21/14, 01/29/15, 02/17/16, 08/31/16, 07/19/17, 09/06/17. To Court Reporter: B. Griffiths.17-42109
01/31/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.18-04289
02/14/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-06152
04/02/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Cases. Nos. 73856/74566.18-12564
04/02/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief.18-12571
04/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: May 2, 2018.18-12573
04/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate. Appellant's Single Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 2, 2018. Nos. 73856/74566.18-13593
05/03/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 73856/74566.18-16839
05/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2018. Nos. 73856/74566.18-17796
06/04/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21002
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21003
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21004
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21005
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21006
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21007
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21009
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21010
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21012
06/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 9. Nos. 73856/74566.18-21013
06/12/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Due Date of Respondents' Brief (Answering).18-22304
06/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 4, 2018. Nos. 73856/74566.18-23708
09/05/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.18-34505
09/05/2018BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.18-34639
10/05/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension to File Reply Brief.18-39200
10/05/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: November 5, 2018. Nos. 73856/74566.18-39214
11/06/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)18-902997
11/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 5, 2018. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)18-904233
12/06/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension to File Reply Brief. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)18-907243
12/07/2018MotionFiled Respondents' Response to Appellant's Second Motion for an Extension of Time to file its Reply Brief. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)18-907464
12/17/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of "Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief." Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)18-908981
12/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 4, 2019. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)18-910574
01/07/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)19-00817
01/07/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Rule 28(f) Pamphlet. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)19-00838
01/07/2019AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 10. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)19-00839
01/07/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)
06/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, July 18, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-23986
07/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-28910
07/18/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. (JH/LS/AS)(SC)
06/16/2020BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Authorities. (SC)20-22524
12/24/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded with instructions." Author: Silver, J.; Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver, JJ. SNP19-JH/LA/AS 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 82. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)20-46481
01/22/2021RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)21-01896
01/22/2021Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
02/05/2021RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 25, 2021. Nos. 73856/74566. (SC)21-01896