Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74575
Short Caption:U.S. BANK NAT'L ASS'N ND VS. RESOURCES GRP., LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A667690Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/08/2017 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/01/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
12/01/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-41462
12/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-41465
12/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.17-41467
12/04/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Kristin A. Schuler-Hintz
12/04/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-41603
12/06/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.17-42038
12/08/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.17-42391
12/20/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-43981
12/21/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.17-44097
12/26/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-44420
12/28/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/01/16, 02/07/17, 02/16/17, 03/30/17, 09/14/17, 10/02/17. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom.17-44809
01/05/2018Transcript RequestFiled Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/01/16, 02/07/17, 02/16/17, 03/30/17, 09/14/17, 10/02/17. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom.18-00632
01/22/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/7/17, 10/2/17 and 10/3/17. Proceedings were not requested to be reported on 9/1/16, 2/16/17, 3/30/17 and 9/14/17; therefore, there is o record to produce.18-02773
03/20/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 4, 2018.18-10925
04/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-12965
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, Part 1.18-12977
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, Part 2.18-13044
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1, Part 3.18-13045
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, Part 1.18-13047
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2, Part 2.18-13049
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3, Part 1.18-13050
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3, Part 2.18-13051
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4, Part 1.18-13052
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4, Part 2.18-13055
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5, Part 1.18-13056
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5, Part 2.18-13057
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5, Part 3.18-13058
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6, Part 1.18-13059
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6, Part 2.18-13060
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7.18-13062
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8.18-13063
04/05/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9.18-13084
04/30/2018MotionFiled Stipulation Between All Counsel For Extension Of Time For Respondent To File Answering Brief.18-16320
04/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 4, 2018.18-16324
06/04/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Four-Day Extension to File Answering Brief.18-21126
06/19/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief and appendix received via E-Flex on June 7, 2018.18-23254
06/19/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-23255
06/19/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.18-23256
07/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 2, 2018.18-27638
07/31/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Michael F. Bohn in place of Richard Vilkin for Respondent).18-29361
08/02/2018MotionFiled Stipulation Between All Counsel for Extension of Time for Appellant to File Reply Brief.18-29756
08/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 9, 2018.18-30203
08/09/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-30646
08/09/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Vacated and Remanded." Before: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC)19-28443
07/22/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y19-30911
07/22/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC)
07/22/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent's Petition for Rehearing (REJECTED: DUPLICATE PETITION FOR REHEARING). (SC)
07/23/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC)
08/20/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: 14 days. (SC).19-34889
08/28/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing due: September 17, 2019. (SC)19-35996
09/16/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Deadline for Filing Appellant's Answer to Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-38560
09/18/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's Answer to the Petition for Rehearing due: October 1, 2019. (SC).19-38993