Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74582
Short Caption:OKADA VS. DIST. CT. (WYNN RESORTS, LTD.)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/04/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Steve L. Morris.
12/04/2017Petition/WritFiled Pettiion for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus - Redacted.17-41556
12/04/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
12/04/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
12/04/2017MotionFiled Motion to File Portions of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus re November 12, 2017 Order and Petitioner's Appendix in Support Thereof Under Seal.17-41557
12/04/2017AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix to Petition for Writ of Prohibition, or in the Alternative Mandamus Vol I (PA001-211).17-41564
12/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Petition and Appendix Under Seal. The clerk of this court shall file the petition for a writ of prohibition or, alternatively, mandamus and the appendix, provisionally received on December 4, 2017, under seal. The appendix provisionally received on December 4, however, includes only pages 1-169 of a 211-page appendix. Accordingly, petitioners shall have 7 days from the date of this order to supplement their appendix with the missing pages; upon receipt of the supplemental appendix, the clerk shall file it under seal.17-42297
12/08/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/8/17).
12/08/2017AppendixFiled Petitioners' Appendix for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume 1 (PA001-211). (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 12/8/17).
12/12/2017AppendixFiled Petitioners' Supplemental Appendix for Writ of Prohibition of Alternatively, Mandamus Volume 1 (SEALED).
01/04/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "The petition is thus denied." EN BANC18-00520
01/29/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-03915
01/29/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.