Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74591
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
12/05/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition.17-41735
12/05/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
12/05/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
12/05/2017AppendixFiled Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition.17-41736
12/05/2017MotionFiled Petitioner Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Volumes II and III of its Appendix to its Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively Prohibition Under Seal.17-41760
12/08/2017MotionFiled Stephen A. Wynn's Motion to Intervene and Join the Petition.17-42261
12/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion And Directing Expedited Answer. The clerk of this court shall file under seal volumes II and III of the appendix, provisionally received on December 8, 2017. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption to add Steve A. Wynn as a petitioner in this proceeding. Having reviewed this petition, it appears that an answer may assist this court in resolving this matter. Answer due: December 22, 2017. Reply due: December 29, 2017.17-42892
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition Volumes 2-3
12/14/2017MotionFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Emergency Motion to Intervene as Real Part in Interest.17-43311
12/14/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice Of Intent To Oppose Elaine P. Wynn's Emergency Motion To Intervene As Real Party In Interest.17-43319
12/15/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Corrected Notice Of Intent To Oppose Elaine P. Wynn's Emergency Motion To Intervene As Real Party In Interest.17-43366
12/19/2017MotionFiled Petitioner Wynn Resorts, Limited's Opposition To Elaine P. Wynn's Motion To Intervene As Real Party In Interest.17-43735
12/19/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) To Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition Of Petition For Writ Of Mandamus Or Alternatively, Prohibition17-43873
12/19/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Intent to Oppose Wynn Resorts, Limited's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) to Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition.17-43915
12/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Elaine P. Wynn''s Notice of Intent to Oppose Emergency Motion for Stay.17-44030
12/21/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest Aruze Parties' Opposition to Petitioner Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Disposition of Its Writ Petition.17-44077
12/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions for Leave to Intervene and for a Stay. Elaine Wynn, a party to the action below, has moved for leave to intervene as a real party in interest to this writ proceeding. We therefore deny the motion.17-44141
12/21/2017MotionFiled Reply Brief on Elaine P. Wynn's Motion to Intervene as Real Party in Interest.17-44147
12/26/2017Petition/WritFiled Answer of Real Parties In Interest To Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition Filed by Wynn Resorts, Limited - Redacted.17-44462
12/26/2017MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest's Motion to Redact Portions of Answer to Wynn's Writ Petition and to Seal Portions of Appendix of Real Parties in Interest17-44465
12/26/2017AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix Volume I.17-44527
12/27/2017AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix Volume II - Redacted.17-44529
12/27/2017AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Limited Volume XII - Redacted.17-44530
12/27/2017AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix Volume XIII.17-44531
01/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for February 6, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes.18-00177
01/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on February 6, 2018 at 2:00 p.m.18-00182
01/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Answer and Appendix Portions under Seal. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the answer to the petition and volume II (partial), volumes III - XI, and volume XII (partial) of the appendix, which were provisionally received in this court on December 26 and 27, 2017. The clerk shall also file petitioners' reply and supplemental appendix, provisionally received in this court on January 2, 2018.18-00569
01/05/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Parties in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 1/5/18).
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix - Portions of Volume II. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 1/5/18).
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix Volumes III-XI. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 1/5/18).
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Real Parties in Interest's Appendix - Portions of Volume XII. (FILED UNDER SEAL PER ORDER 1/5/18).
01/05/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply In Support Of Petition For Writ Of Mandamus Or Alternatively, Prohibition. (FILED PER ORDER 1/5/18).18-00570
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Petitioners' Supplemental Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition. (FILED PER ORDER 1/5/18).18-00571
01/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-02862
01/23/2018MotionFiled Real Parties in Interests' Motion To Redact Portions Of Emergency Motion To Defer Consideration of The Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument Is Scheduled For February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings In District Cou18-03061
01/23/2018MotionFiled Aruze Parties' NRCP 27(E) Emergency Motion To Defer Consideration Of The Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument Is Scheduled For February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (Redacted).18-03062
01/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Redact/Seal and Directing Response. Real parties in interest shall have until Thursday, January 25, 2018, to submit to this court an unredacted motion to defer and the supplemental appendix containing the exhibits to which the motion refers; upon receipt, the clerk shall file these documents under seal. Petitioners shall have until 4:00 p.m. on Friday, January 26, 2018, to file a response to the motion to defer. fn1[For purposes of responding to the motion to defer, documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.]18-03231
01/24/2018MotionFiled Real Parties in Interest Aruze Parties' NRCP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (SEALED).
01/24/2018AppendixFiled Supplemental Appendix in Support of Answer of Real Parties in Interest to Petition For Writ of Mandamus or Alternatively, Prohibition Filed by Wynn Resorts, Limited (SEALED).
01/26/2018MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Opposition to Aruze Parties' NRCP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, on which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (REDACTED).18-03818
01/26/2018MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Opposition to Aruze Parties' NRCP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, on which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (SEALED) (Via Fax).
01/29/2018MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Opposition to Aruze Parties' NRCP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, on which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (SEALED) (ORIGINAL).
01/29/2018MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact its Opposition to Aruze Parties' NRCP 27(e) Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration and File Exhibits 1-4 Under Seal.18-03872
01/29/2018MotionFiled Aruze Parties' Reply in Support of Their Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (REDACTED).18-03895
01/29/2018MotionFiled Motion to Redact Portions of Aruze Parties' Reply in Support of Their Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court.18-03897
01/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions for Leave to Redact/File Documents Under Seal and Directing Status Report. The clerk of this court shall file under seal real parties in interest's unredacted reply, provisionally received in this court on January 29, 2018. In light of the district court hearing scheduled for February 5, 2018, we direct the parties to file in this court a joint status report detailing the status of the district court motion for NRCP 60(b) relief by 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, February 6, 2018.18-04126
01/30/2018MotionFiled Aruze Parties' Reply in Support of Their Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (SEALED) via fax.
01/31/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from CNBC Business News Asking Permission to Have Live Camera's Inside Courtroom. (via Fax).18-04285
01/31/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Ryan Ruggiero of CNBC Business News is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 1:30 p.m.18-04316
02/01/2018MotionFiled ORIGINAL Aruze Parties' Reply in Support of Their Emergency Motion to Defer Consideration of the Pending Writ Petition, On Which Oral Argument is Scheduled for February 6, 2018, Pending Further Proceedings in District Court (SEALED).
02/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Aruze Parties' Status Report of the District Court's Decision on February 5, 2018.18-04940
02/06/2018MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Response to Okada Parties' Status Report.18-04944
02/06/2018MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Exhibit 1 to its Response to Okada Parties' Status Report Under Seal.18-04946
02/06/2018MotionFiled Motion to Strike Wynn Resorts Limited's Response to Okada Parties' Status Report.18-04971
02/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal. The clerk of this court shall file under seal Exhibit 1 to the response, provisionally received in this court on February 6, 2018.18-04976
02/06/2018MotionFiled Exhibit to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Response to Okada Parties' Status Report (SEALED).
02/06/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "We deny this petition for extraordinary writ relief, without prejudice and we vacate today's oral argument in this case." fn3[Real parties in interest's February 6, 2018, motion to strike petitioners' response to the status report is denied.] EN BANC18-05008
03/05/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-08541
03/05/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.