Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74600
Short Caption:DOYLE (ANTONIO) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):30374, 33216, 37293, 58289, 60204, 60756, 60817, 62409, 62807
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C120438Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:DouglasCase Status:Remittitur Stayed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/29/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/05/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
12/05/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-41860
12/06/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Minutes (SEALED).
12/20/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-43985
12/22/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-44365
12/28/2017OtherJustice Michael L Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Sat in District Court Proceedings.
04/04/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Request For Extension Of Time Within Which To File Opening Brief.18-12924
04/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 4, 2018.18-13595
05/04/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-17083
05/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-17084
06/01/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-20814
06/29/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-24844
06/29/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)19-38427
10/01/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-40777
11/07/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-45868
11/08/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay the Issuance of Remittitur. (SC)19-45998
11/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur is hereby stayed until March 31, 2020. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 31, 2020, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 31, 2020, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. (SC)19-47668
02/19/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on February 3, 2020 and placed on the docket as Case No. 19-7647. (SC)20-06761