Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74649
Short Caption:BENFORD, III VS. JONES-BENFORDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73726, 73726-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D530907Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/11/2019 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/11/2019How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/13/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. (Appellant Benford, III and Appellant Lebow)
12/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED)
12/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days. (Appellant Benford, III and Appellant Lebow)17-42898
12/13/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Ross C. Goodman. (Appellant Benford, III)
12/21/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ronald M. Lebow Attorney at Law. Check no. 2929. (Appellant Ronald M. Lebow)
01/18/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order. This joint appeal was docketed in this court on December 13, 2017, without payment of the requisite filing fee. On that same day a notice was issued directing appellants to pay the filing fee within ten days. Appellant Vassal Gradington Benford, III's counsel submitted the filing fee on December 13, 2017. Appellant Ronald L. Lebow submitted his fee on December 21, 2017. Because appellants filed a joint notice of appeal, only one fee was due. Therefore, the second filing fee paid on December 21, 2017, shall be refunded. fn1 [The clerk of this court is directed to refund the $250 filing fee tendered on December 21, 2017.]18-02444
01/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-02532
02/08/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (Part 1).18-05211
02/08/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (Part 2).18-05216
02/08/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (Part 3).18-05222
02/08/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. (Part 4).18-05223
02/13/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Amended Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement).18-05833
02/13/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 7/12/16, 6/13/17.18-05957
02/21/2018TranscriptFiled Errata to Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Gurule stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/12/16, 06/13/17.18-06802
05/10/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant Vassal Gradington Benford, lll's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 1, 2018.18-17731
05/17/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time -Second Request (Opening Brief & Appendix).18-19021
05/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant Vassal Gradington Benford, lll's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. If counsel for Benford intends to also represent Lebow in this appeal, he shall file a notice of appearance of counsel in accordance with NRAP 46(a)(2) within 5 days of the date of this order.18-19805
05/25/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Ross Goodman as Counsel for Appellant Ronald LeBow).18-20187
06/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Appellant Ronald Lebow's Opening Brief and Appendix Due: 11 days.18-22189
06/12/2018MotionFiled Motion for Enlargement of Time for Appellant Ronald Lebow's Opening Brief.18-22384
06/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant Ronald L. Lebow shall have until July 23, 2018, to file and serve a joint opening brief and appendix with appellant Vassal Gradington Benfors, lll.18-23767
07/02/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Opening Brief.18-25047
07/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 22, 2018.18-27985
08/23/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-32916
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I.18-33012
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II.18-33016
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III.18-33018
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV.18-33019
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V.18-33020
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI.18-33057
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VII.18-33058
08/23/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VIII.18-33059
08/24/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IX.18-33163
08/24/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume X.18-33164
08/24/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XI.18-33166
08/24/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XII.18-33167
08/24/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume XIII.18-33168
09/21/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 8, 2018.18-37035
10/09/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-39414
10/09/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.18-39427
10/09/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement.18-39661
11/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.18-903593
11/13/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-903725
11/13/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 11, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-18713
05/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-23263
06/11/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before Northern Nevada Panel. KP/RP/EC (SC)