Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74816
Short Caption:RANCHO BEL AIR PROP. OWNERS ASS'N, UNIT 2, INC. VS. FRIEDRICHCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A711287Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:01/09/2018 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/10/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/08/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
01/08/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-00889
01/08/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-00894
01/08/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from James W. Pengilly. Check no. 1016.
01/08/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-01011
01/09/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley.18-01219
01/30/2018Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-04130
01/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).18-04134
01/30/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service of Docketing Statement.18-04193
02/12/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-05774
02/13/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-05919
03/01/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/19/17, 6/20/17, 6/21/17, 6/22/17, 6/23/17, 6/26/17, 6/27/17, 6/28/17, 6/29/17, 10/24/17. To Court Reporter: Robin Page.18-08213
04/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Amended Docketing Statement. Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement due: 30 days.18-12438
04/11/2018MotionFiled Court Recorder's Motion Requesting Extension of Time to File Transcripts.18-13954
04/19/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Christine Erickson's Notice of Completion of Transcripts due: May 29, 2018. Given the extension of time to file the requested transcripts, we also extend the time to file the opening brief and appendix. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 20, 2018.18-14947
04/30/2018Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Amended Docketing Statement.18-16268
05/01/2018Docketing StatementFiled Respondents' Response, Pursuant to NRAP 14(f) to Defendant's Docketing Statement.18-16497
05/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended.18-17827
05/31/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christine Erickson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: June 19-23, 26-29, 2017 and October 24, 2017.18-20651
06/11/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.18-21976
07/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.18-24957
08/31/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-34196
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1.18-34197
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2.18-34198
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3.18-34199
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4.18-34200
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5.18-34201
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6.18-34202
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7.18-34203
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 8.18-34204
08/31/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 9.18-34205
09/13/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 15, 2018.18-35793
10/15/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-40473
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.18-40474
11/13/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-903815
11/13/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
05/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-20577