Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74901
Short Caption:MENENDEZ-CORDERO (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR151674Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:05/06/2019 at 4:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/06/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/19/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
01/19/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-02643
01/25/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-03695
02/22/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Judith Schonlau stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/6/17, 10/9/17, 10/10/17, 10/11/17, 10/12/17, 10/13/17, 10/16/17, 12/19/17.18-06950
05/18/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to file Appellant's Opening Brief.18-19185
05/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: June 20, 2018.18-19187
06/20/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file the Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.18-23625
06/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 20, 2018.18-24628
07/20/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File the Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.18-27831
08/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 20, 2018.18-29600
08/16/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-31823
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume One.18-31825
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Two.18-31826
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Three.18-31827
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Four.18-31830
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Five.18-31831
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Six.18-31832
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Seven.18-31833
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Eight.18-31835
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Nine.18-31836
08/16/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Ten.18-31837
09/17/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).18-36199
09/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 17, 2018.18-36203
10/17/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Trial Exhibits.18-40844
10/17/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Transmit Juror Questionnaires.18-40846
10/17/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix.18-40926
10/18/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-40957
10/31/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court clerk shall have 15 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, jury trial exhibits 133 ("I-Web Disc"); 134 ("Phone Call Disc"); and 135 ("FBI Verbatim Translation"); admitted on October 11, 2017. The motion requesting that this court direct the district court clerk to transmit jury questionnaires is denied.18-42756
11/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 3, 2018. (SC).18-904712
11/27/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-905829
11/27/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
11/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Transmit Exhibits. The district court clerk shall have 15 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, jury trial exhibits 133 ("I-Web Disc"); 134 ("Phone Call Disc"); and 135 ("FBI Verbatim Translation"); admitted on October 11, 2017. (SC)18-906241
04/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, May 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City. (SC)19-14734
04/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescheduling Oral Argument. This matter is scheduled for oral argument before the en banc court on May 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. To accommodate the court's calendar, oral argument will be held on Monday, May 6, 2019, before the en banc court at 4:00 p.m. in Carson City. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)19-17336
04/22/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-17586
05/06/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
07/25/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No.29. EN BANC (SC)19-31363
08/20/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).19-34849
08/20/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).