Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75001
Short Caption:PEREZ (GERARDO) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A753832Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Stayed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/02/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
02/02/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-04605
02/21/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/28/17. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent.18-06723
02/21/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-06791
02/23/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Jessica Perlick for Respondents).18-07178
06/04/2018MotionFiled Appellant's First Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-21109
06/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 3, 2018.18-21671
08/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-29942
08/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.18-29943
09/05/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-34630
12/21/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. No reply brief filed. (SC)
03/15/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP19-JH/LS/AS. (SC).19-11598
03/28/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Reissue Order as a Published Opinion. (SC)19-13804
05/10/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Publication. A published opinion affirming the district court's order will be forthcoming. Issuance of the remittitur is stayed pending publication of the opinion. (SC)19-20607
07/03/2019Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-28440