Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75095
Short Caption:CLARK CTY. OFFICE OF THE CORONER/MED. EXAM'R VS. LAS VEGAS REVIEW JOURNALCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74604, 76436
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A758501Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing in Progress
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:02/14/2018 / Kunin, IsraelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/13/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
02/13/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-05962
02/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-05964
02/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. (Attorney Micah Echols with Marquis Aurbach Coffing for appellant.)18-06123
02/14/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Israel Kunin.18-06180
02/21/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-06746
02/22/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-06851
03/01/2018Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Notice of No Transcripts to Be Requested.18-08298
03/05/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Docketing Statement due: March 19, 2018.18-08558
03/08/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e).18-09291
03/14/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-10095
03/14/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 74604/75095.18-10129
03/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay. We stay enforcement of the February 1, 2018, district court order awarding attorney fees and costs in Case No. A-17-758501-W, pending further order of this court. Respondent shall have until Wednesday, March 21, 2018, to file and serve a response to the motion for stay.18-10200
03/19/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 74604/75095.18-10585
03/20/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Leave to File Response in Excess of Page/Type Volume Limitation.18-10792
03/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk of this court shall file the 17-page opposition to appellant's motion for a stay, provisionally received on March 20, 2018.18-11103
03/21/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Motion Opposition to Emergency Motion for Relief Under NRAP 27(e).18-11104
03/26/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 74604/75095.18-11647
03/28/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Reply in Support of Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e).18-11966
03/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to consolidate the appeals. We deny the motion. Although the cases will not be formally consolidated, they will nonetheless be clustered based on the related subject matter to ensure that the appeals are resolved in a consistent and efficient manner. Nos. 74604/75095.18-12040
04/12/2018Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. Motion granted. Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Cherry, J., concurring in part and dissenting in part. Fn1[The honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 24. EN BANC18-14015
05/01/2018Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.18-16419
05/22/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.18-19525
05/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 22,2018.18-19533
06/22/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Reconsideration. Having considered respondent's motion for reconsideration of our opinion, we deny the motion. fn1[We construe respondent's May 1, 2018, petition for rehearing of our opinion granting a stay as a motion for reconsideration.] Cherry, J., dissenting.18-23843
06/22/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-23948
06/22/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.18-23949
06/22/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.18-23955
06/22/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.18-23956
06/22/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5.18-23958
06/22/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service for Joint Appendix, Volumes 1-5.18-23959
06/22/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-24039
07/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 18, 2018.18-24986
07/19/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-27529
08/17/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief (First Request).18-31898
08/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 19, 2018.18-31900
09/17/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Answering Brief (Second Request).18-36319
09/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 19, 2018.18-37799
10/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. (McLetchie Law, f/k/a McLetchie Shell)18-40330
10/22/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-41358
11/15/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 5, 2018. (SC)18-904454
11/20/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Jackie Nichols as counsel for Appellant). (SC)18-905074