Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75178
Short Caption:DIGNITY HEALTH VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75335, 75374, 75427, 75429, 75432, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Shirley Blazich.
02/26/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Exhibits.18-07348
02/26/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-07349
02/26/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-07350
02/26/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-07351
02/26/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-07353
02/26/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-07354
03/05/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Scott Selco, MD's Motion for Leave to Join in Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Dignity Health.18-08596
03/13/2018MotionFiled Petitioners Bhatia, Jamison, Gordon and Inpatient Consultants of Nevada, Inc's Motion for Leave to Join Dignity Health's Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-09825
03/20/2018MotionFiled Petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion to Consolidate Writ Proceedings. Nos. 75178/75335/75374.18-10909
03/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service of Petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion to Consolidate Writ Proceedings.18-11091
03/23/2018MotionFiled Petitioner Dignity Health's Motion for Stay of Order Compelling Disclosure of Tax Returns and Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed February 26, 2018 Pursuant to NRAP 8.18-11390
03/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Join Petition and Denying Motions to Consolidate. The clerk shall modify the caption of Docket No. 75178 to add Scott Selco, M.D., Inpatient Consultants of Nevada, Inc., Shalini Bhatia, D.O., Jessica Gordon, D.O., and Nerie Jamison, DNP as petitioners. Scott M. Selco, petitioner in Docket No. 75374, has filed motions to consolidate that petition with the petitions in Docket Nos. 75178 and 75335. We decline to consolidate the petitions at this time. Nos. 75178/75335/75374.18-12128
04/04/2018MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Opposition To Petitioner Dignity Health D/B/A St. Rose Dominican Hospital-Siena Campus' Motion For Stay Of Order Compelling Disclosure Of Tax Returns And Stay Of Trial Pending Resolutio18-12790
04/09/2018MotionFiled Petitioner Dignity Health's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed Under NRAP 27(e). Action Necessary on or Before Monday, April 23, 2018.18-13507
04/09/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Real Party in Interest's Notice of Intent to Oppose Emergency Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Filed Under NRAP 27(e).18-13581
04/10/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s Joinder in Petitioner Dignity Health's Emergency Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed Under NRAP 27(e).18-13684
04/11/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petitioner Dignity Health d/b/a St. Rose Dominican Hospital- Siena Campus' Motion for Stay of Order Compelling Disclosure of Tax Returns and Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed February 26, 2018 Pursuant to NRAP 8.18-13943
04/12/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny petitioners' March 23 and April 9, 2018, stay motions.] NNP18-MD/KP/JH.18-14113
05/10/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-17771
05/10/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.