Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75184
Short Caption:STATE VS. BROWN (TAREN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):75184-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR171851Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Suppression
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/26/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/26/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal from Grant of Motion to Suppress. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Filed by Washoe County DA)18-07443
02/26/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal from Grant of Motion to Suppress. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Submitted by Washoe Dist. Ct. Clerk)18-07446
02/26/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal.18-07519
02/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed in this court an emergency motion to stay the district court proceedings pending resolution of the appeal. We elect to transfer the motion to the court of appeals for resolution. We clarify that, at this time, only appellant's motion is transferred to the court of appeals, and the transfer is for the limited purpose of resolving the motion. This case will otherwise proceed in the supreme court until further order of this court, and all future documents not related to the motion shall be filed in this court. In light of this order, the clerk shall transfer the motion to the court of appeals; all other documents shall remain filed in this court. The clerk shall file this order in both this court and the court of appeals. fn1[If the parties wish to file any additional documents related to the emergency motion for stay, such documents shall be captioned "In the Court of Appeals of the State of Nevada." Additionally, as electronic filing is not available in the court of appeals, all documents filed in that court must be filed in person, by mail or third-party commercial carrier, or, if appropriate, by deposit in the Supreme Court drop box or facsimile.]18-07625
02/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.18-07631
02/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file points and authorities. Respondent shall have 11 days therefore to file opposing points and authorities.18-07705
02/28/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John Reese Petty as counsel for Respondent)18-07842
03/06/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Misty Hubert stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/21/18 and 02/23/18.18-08757
03/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Emilie Meyer for Respondent).18-09605
03/13/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit Exhibit A.18-09689
03/13/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Appellant's Brief in Support of Good Cause for Appeal (Points and Authorities).18-09803
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Points and Authorities.18-09806
03/23/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to State's Brief in Support of Good Cause for Appeal.18-11355
04/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibit. The district court clerk shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit Exhibit A, admitted in the district court on February 21, 2018.18-13424
04/13/2018ExhibitFiled Exhibit (original). Exhibit: A (CD).
10/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. The supplemental briefs shall comply with the type-volume limitations in NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). The State's brief is due 11 days from the date of this order, with Brown's brief to follow 11 days from service of the State's brief. No reply shall be filed.18-39926
10/22/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief in Support of Good Cause for Appeal.18-41498
10/25/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Brief in Opposition to State's Brief in Support of Good Cause for Appeal.18-42194
12/20/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Dismissed." Fn3[In light of this opinion, we vacate the April 9, 2018 stay of trial imposed by the Nevada Court of Appeals in this matter.] Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Gibbons. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 102. NNP18-KP/MG/JH (SC)18-909619
01/14/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibit (original). Exhibit: A (CD) this day. (SC)19-02011
01/14/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)