Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75198
Short Caption:BOESIGER VS. DESERT APPRAISALS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A725567Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/07/2018 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/30/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/27/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
02/27/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-07716
02/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-07718
02/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.18-07720
03/05/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from David J. Winterton & Assoc., LTD. Check No. 11488.
03/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-08722
03/07/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel.18-08974
03/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall, within ten days from the date of this order, file the case appeal statement with the Supreme Court Clerk's Office.18-10291
03/15/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement.18-10359
03/15/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge.18-10364
03/19/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-10573
03/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge.18-10576
03/19/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service (Case Appeal Statement).18-10600
03/19/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proof of Service Certificate (Docketing Statement).18-10601
04/10/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-13719
04/11/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-13970
04/17/2018Transcript RequestFiled Notice of No Transcript to Order under N.R.A.P. 9 but Notice of Statement of Evidence When Proceedings Were Not Recorded Will Be Filed Pursuant to N.R.A.P. 9(d).18-14603
07/10/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Opening Brief.18-26120
07/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: August 9, 2018.18-26659
08/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Opening Brief due: 5 days.18-30709
08/09/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-30733
08/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-30734
08/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.18-30735
08/09/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.18-30736
09/06/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondents Answering Brief due: September 24, 2018.18-34813
09/25/2018BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.18-37446
10/24/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 8, 2018.18-41882
11/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Reply Brief due: 5 days. (SC)18-903072
11/13/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)18-903767
11/13/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/30/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-18812
07/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Pickering/Cadish. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 25. NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC)19-28441