Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75208
Short Caption:ANDERSEN (CHRISTOPHER) VS. DIST. CT. (CITY OF LAS VEGAS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73656, 74712
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C319933Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Habeas Corpus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Writ Issued
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/22/2019 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:01/22/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/28/2018Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
02/28/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus or Alternatively Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-08076
02/28/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.18-08077
03/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answering. Petitioner shall have 5 days from the date of this order within which to serve the petition and appendix on the district court judge and to file proof of such service with this court. Answer to Petition for Writ due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 11 days from service of the answer within which to file and serve any reply.18-10382
03/20/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus or Alternatively Petition for Writ of Mandamus).18-10953
04/10/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer Opposing Issuance of Requested Writ (Answer to Petition for Writ).18-13746
04/23/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ.18-15385
07/25/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-28498
12/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. The 2019 Sothern Nevada will hold oral argument in this matter on January 22, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC).18-907033
01/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-01369
01/16/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (John G. Watkins assisting Michael Pariente for Petitioner). (SC)19-02632
01/17/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (David Kheel as counsel for Appellant). (SC)19-02862
01/22/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel JH/LS/AS (SC).
09/12/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 42. (SC)19-38084
09/12/2019WritFiled Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to Attorney Michael D. Pariente for service upon Judge Rob Bare. (SC)19-38205