Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75213
Short Caption:ZUNIGA (VALENTIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):58267
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C260472Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/04/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/01/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/01/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-08214
03/16/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/18/10, 3/15/11, 3/22/11, 2/12/13, 2/19/13, 3/19/13, 4/2/13, 7/2/13, 7/16/13, 5/8/14, 5/15/14 and 7/15/14. To Court Reporter: Bill Nelson, Cheryl Gardner, Robert Cangemi and Renee Silvaggio.18-10431
03/16/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/9/16, 10/4/16, 11/10/16, 12/6/16, 2/18/17, 12/19/17 and 12/27/17. To Court Reporter: Yvette Sison.18-10434
03/30/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robert Cangemi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/12/13, 4/2/13 and 7/2/13.18-12366
04/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.18-13164
04/06/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-13213
04/16/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Robert Cangemi stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/15/14.18-14489
04/16/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Bill Nelson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/18/10, 2/19/13, 3/19/13, 5/8/14 and 7/15/14.18-14493
06/29/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 13, 2018.18-24780
07/12/2018MotionFiled Court Recorder Yvette Sison's Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and File Transcript.18-26691
07/13/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-26787
07/18/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Yvette Sison stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 8/9/16, 10/4/16, 11/10/16, 126/16, 2/28/17 12/19/17 and 12/27/17.18-27447
07/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Court Recorder Yvette G. Sison's Certificate of Delivery due: August 20, 2018. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 11, 2018.18-28565
10/11/2018MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request).18-39983
10/17/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief (Second Request).18-40916
10/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion.. Appellant shall have until November 13, 2018, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix18-41981
11/13/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-903909
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I Part 1. (SC)18-903912
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I Part 2. (SC)18-903957
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II. (SC)18-903938
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume III. (SC)18-903940
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV Part I. (SC)18-903953
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume IV Part 2. (SC)18-903959
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume V. (SC)18-903955
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume VI. (SC)18-903956
12/05/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-907178
12/05/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)18-907196
01/04/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)19-00603
01/04/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: February 4, 2019. (SC)19-00609
02/04/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-05381
02/04/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)