Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75323
Short Caption:ARTEMIS EXPL. CO. VS. RUBY LAKE ESTATES HOACourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63338, 77721
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - CV-C-12-175Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:05/16/2019 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:05/16/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/13/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Gerber Law Offices. Check no. 5410.
03/13/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-09705
03/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-09708
03/14/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief.18-09985
03/27/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-11748
03/30/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-12320
04/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file a reply within 11 days of service of appellant's response. Briefing is suspended.18-12985
05/04/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.18-17007
05/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days.18-17560
08/07/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.18-30296
08/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1.18-30297
08/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2.18-30300
08/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3.18-30301
08/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4.18-30303
08/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5.18-30305
08/30/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Additional Time to File Answering Brief.18-34041
08/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: October 8, 2018.18-34043
10/08/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-39356
10/08/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1.18-39357
11/07/2018BriefFiled Appelants' Reply Brief. (SC)18-903282
11/07/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on May 16, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. (SC)19-10558
05/02/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-19406
05/16/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. KP/RP/EC (SC)