Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75335
Short Caption:AKBARULLAH, M.D. VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75178, 75374, 75427, 75429, 75432, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/13/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from John M. Naylor.
03/13/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extradorinary Relief.18-09864
03/13/2018OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-09875
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-09876
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-09877
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-09878
03/13/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-09879
03/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Amended Certificate of Service (Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief).18-09964
03/20/2018MotionFiled Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion to Consolidate Writ Proceedings. Nos. 75178/75335/75374.18-10912
03/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service of Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion to Consolidate Writ Proceedings.18-11097
03/26/2018MotionFiled Brian Lipman M.D.'s Motion for Leave to Join Syed Akbarullah M.D.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-11572
03/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Join Petition and Denying Motions to Consolidate. The clerk shall modify the caption of Docket No. 75178 to add Scott Selco, M.D., Inpatient Consultants of Nevada, Inc., Shalini Bhatia, D.O., Jessica Gordon, D.O., and Nerie Jamison, DNP as petitioners. Scott M. Selco, petitioner in Docket No. 75374, has filed motions to consolidate that petition with the petitions in Docket Nos. 75178 and 75335. We decline to consolidate the petitions at this time. Nos. 75178/75335/75374.18-12134
04/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption to include Brian Lipman, M.D. as a petitioner.18-13432
04/12/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." NNP18-MD/KP/JH.18-14185
05/10/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-17773
05/10/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.