Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75349
Short Caption:REGALA (JOSEPH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54974
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C232842Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/11/2019How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/14/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
03/14/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-10114
03/16/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.18-10427
03/19/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/5/18. To Court Reporter: DC Dept. 20.18-10648
05/03/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Angie Calvillo stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/05/18.18-16944
07/12/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-26597
07/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 10, 2018.18-28566
09/10/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.18-35116
09/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 10, 2018.18-36785
10/10/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-39748
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1.18-39751
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2.18-39753
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 3.18-39757
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 4.18-39758
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 5.18-39759
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 6.18-39760
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 7.18-39767
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 8.18-39768
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 9.18-39770
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 10.18-39771
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 11.18-39772
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 12.18-39774
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 13.18-39775
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 14.18-39776
10/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 15.18-39778
11/13/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-903785
11/13/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-903790
12/13/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. (SC)18-908452
12/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: January 14, 2019. (SC)18-908469
01/11/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-01690
01/11/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. (SC)