Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75374
Short Caption:SELCO, M.D. VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75178, 75335, 75427, 75429, 75432, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/20/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Alice Campos Mercado.
03/20/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Scott Selco, M.D.18-10719
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-10753
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-10763
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-10764
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-10765
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-10766
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6, Part 1.18-10767
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6, Part 2.18-10769
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7.18-10771
03/20/2018MotionFiled Petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion to Consolidate Writ Proceedings. Nos. 75178/75335/75374.18-10907
03/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service of Petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion to Consolidate Writ Proceedings.18-11087
03/21/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Stay of Order Compelling Disclosure of Tax Returns and Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-11149
03/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Join Petition and Denying Motions to Consolidate. The clerk shall modify the caption of Docket No. 75178 to add Scott Selco, M.D., Inpatient Consultants of Nevada, Inc., Shalini Bhatia, D.O., Jessica Gordon, D.O., and Nerie Jamison, DNP as petitioners. Scott M. Selco, petitioner in Docket No. 75374, has filed motions to consolidate that petition with the petitions in Docket Nos. 75178 and 75335. We decline to consolidate the petitions at this time. Nos. 75178/75335/75374.18-12135
03/30/2018MotionFiled Real Party's Opposition To Petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion For Stay Of Order Compelling Disclosure Of Tax Returns And Stay Of Trial Pending Resolution Of Petition For Writ Of Mandamus.18-12381
04/03/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply to Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion for Stay of Order Compelling Disclosure of Tax Returns and Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-12643
04/19/2018MotionFiled Dignity Health d/b/a/ St. Rose Dominican Hospital-Siena Campus' Motion for Leave to Join Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Scott Selco, M.D.18-14949
04/23/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [We grant Dignity Health's April 19, 2018, motion to join this writ petition. The clerk of the court shall modify the caption on the docket for this case to conform with the caption of this order.] fn2 [In light of this order, we deny petitioner Scott Selco, M.D.'s March 21, 2018, stay motion.] NNP18-MD/KP/JH.18-15463
05/18/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-19062
05/18/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.