Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75427
Short Caption:GORDON, D.O. VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75178, 75335, 75374, 75429, 75432, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition.
03/27/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioners Gordon and Inpatient Consultants of Nevada Inc., a Medical Corporation's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-11701
03/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-11703
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-11704
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-11705
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-11706
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-11707
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-11708
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.18-11709
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7.18-11710
03/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Petition for Writ and Volumes 1-5).18-11832
04/16/2018MotionFiled Dignity Health's Motion for Leave to Join in Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Gordon and Inpatient Consultants of Nevada, Inc., A Medical Corporation.18-14404
04/24/2018MotionFiled Brian Lipman M.D.'s Motion For Leave To Join In Petition For Writ Of Mandamus Of Gordon And Inpatient Consultants Of Nevada Inc., A Medical Corporation.18-15588
05/10/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioners' Notice of Withdrawal of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-17904
05/11/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. "This petition is dismissed." fn1 [Dignity Health's motion for leave to join in petition for writ of mandamus filed April 16, 2018, and Brian Lipman M.D.'s motion for leave to join in petition for writ of mandamus filed April 24, 2018, are denied as moot.] (VACATED PER ORDER 5/16/18).18-17990
05/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter was dismissed on May 11, 2018, because the filing fee was not paid. Accordingly, we take no action on the notice of withdrawal of petition filed on May 10, 2018.18-18367
05/15/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from John H. Cotton. E-Payment Ref. no. 18032945912844. (E-payment made 3/29/18).
05/16/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order/Voluntary Dismissal. We vacate our May 11, 2018, order dismissing the petition for failure to pay the filing fee. "On May 10, 2018, petitioner filed a motion to voluntarily withdraw the petition for extraordinary relief. Cause appearing, the motion is granted." fn1[Dignity Health's motion for leave to join in the petition for extraordinary relief filed on April 16, 2018, and Brian Lipman M.D.'s motion for leave to join in the petition for extraordinary relief filed on April 24, 2018, are denied as moot.] Case Closed/No Remittitur Issued.18-18702