Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75429
Short Caption:BHATIA, D.O. VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75178, 75335, 75374, 75427, 75432, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition.
03/27/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition Bhatia Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-11727
03/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-11729
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-11730
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-11731
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-11732
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-11733
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-11734
03/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Petition for Writ and Appendix Volumes 1-5).18-11831
03/29/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from John H. Cotton
04/16/2018MotionFiled Dignity Health's Motion for Leave to Join in Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Shalini Bhatia, D.O.18-14409
04/30/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [On April 16, 2018, Dignity Health filed a motion to join this writ petition. Dignity Health was not included in petitioner's summary judgment motion, and nothing in the appendix shows that Dignity Health later joined in the motion. While Dignity Health states that the rulings challenged in this petition affect Dignity Health, petitioner challenges the order denying her summary judgment, not the rulings set forth in Dignity Health's motion to join the petition, Thus, we deny the motion to join.] NNP18-MD/KP/JH.18-16236
05/25/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-20099
05/25/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.