Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75432
Short Caption:INPATIENT CONSULTANTS OF NEVADA, INC. VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75178, 75335, 75374, 75427, 75429, 75730, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/27/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Petition.
03/27/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioners Inpatient Consultants of Nevada Inc, A Medical Corporation, Bhatia, Gordon and Jamison's Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Other Relief.18-11755
03/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-11757
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-11758
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-11759
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-11760
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-11761
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-11762
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.18-11763
03/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 7.18-11764
03/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Petition for Writ and Appendix Volumes 1-7).18-11833
03/29/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from John H. Cotton
04/16/2018MotionFiled Dignity Health's Motion for Leave to Join in Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Inpatient Consultants of Nevada, Inc., A Medical Corporation , Bhatia , Gordon and Jamison.18-14390
04/24/2018MotionFiled Brian Lipman M.D.'S Motion For Leave To Join In Petition For Writ Of Mandamus Of Inpatient Consultants Of Nevada Inc., A Medical Corporation, Bhatia, Gordon And Jamison.18-15556
04/30/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [We grant Dignity Health's April 16 and Brian Lipman, M.D.'s April 24 motions to join this writ petition. The clerk of the court shall modify the caption on the docket for this case to conform to the caption of this order.] NNP18-MD/KP/JH.18-16240
05/25/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-20097
05/25/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.