Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 75477
Short Caption:CHANDRA VS. SCHULTECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D458809Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/15/2019 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:10/15/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/02/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing Fee Waived. State/County/Municipality.
04/02/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (SEALED)
04/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.18-12417
04/04/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: November 30, 2017. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services.18-12822
04/19/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-15129
04/23/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/30/17.18-15480
06/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Briefing is suspended.18-23786
06/28/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.18-24718
08/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Acting Chief Deputy Attorney General David J. Pope and Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Bordelove as Counsel for Appellant).18-31306
08/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Amended Certificate of Service for Notice of Appearance.18-31350
11/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Part. "We dismiss this appeal from the May 18, 2018, order and the judgment against William Schulte." Briefing of this appeal is reinstated as to the portion of the appeal challenging the orders directing payment from the Fund. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days. (SC).18-906487
01/23/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 12, 2019.19-03628
02/12/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-06690
02/13/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume I. (SC)19-06696
02/13/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume II. (SC)19-06700
02/13/2019AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume III. (SC)19-06702
03/11/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent Melanie Schulte's Answering Brief due: March 28, 2019. (SC)19-10713
03/27/2019BriefFiled Respondent Melani Schulte's Answering Brief. (SC)19-13672
04/26/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 10, 2019. (SC)19-18357
05/10/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-20568
05/10/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
09/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 15, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.19-38784
10/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-40785
10/15/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
12/26/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 66. (SC)19-52117
01/13/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent Melani Schulte's Petition For Rehearing (SC)20-01696
01/13/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Amberlea S. Davis. (SC)
01/14/2020Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (SC)20-01828
01/21/2020Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service (Petition for Rehearing). (SC)20-02915
02/14/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)20-06222