Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75487
Short Caption:FAIR (GARY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A764995Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/09/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/03/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-12689
04/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry and Transmission of Written Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.18-15226
05/04/2018Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on May 2, 2018. Decision and Order.18-16996
05/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Natasha Gebrael, Deputy Attorney General for Respondents).18-17066
05/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.18-17559
05/16/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice - Notice of Entry of Order. Decision and Order filed in District Court on 05/02/18.18-18649
05/22/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-19484
05/22/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal.18-19485
05/22/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA)18-19591
07/09/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
05/20/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Stay Request. (SC)19-22010
05/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a pro se motion to stay all further proceedings in this matter. No cause appearing, the motion is denied. (SC)19-22914