Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75534
Short Caption:CLARK CTY. SCHOOL DIST. VS. LAS VEGAS REVIEW-JOURNALCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73525, 73525-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A750151Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
04/09/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-13453
04/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-13465
04/11/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief.18-13876
04/30/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-16260
05/04/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-17046
08/08/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing the Opening Brief to September 7, 2018.18-30369
08/08/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 7, 2018.18-30371
09/07/2018BriefFiled Apellant's Opening Brief.18-34948
09/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I.18-34949
09/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II.18-34950
09/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III.18-34951
09/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IV.18-34952
09/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V.18-34953
09/07/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI.18-34954
09/27/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request).18-37803
09/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 7, 2018.18-37807
10/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. (McLetchie Law, f/k/a McLetchie Shell)18-40332
11/07/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume I. (SC)18-903362
11/07/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume II. (SC)18-903363
11/07/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume III. (SC)18-903364
11/08/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-903409
12/05/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Reply Brief due: December 24, 2018. (SC)18-907086
12/24/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-910185
12/24/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.(SC)
08/07/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Substitution of Attorney (Melissa Alessi in place of Adam Honey for Appellant). (SC)19-33194