Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75593
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 68046, 69737, 71577, 72766, 72897, 73837, 74517
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
04/17/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-14612
04/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.18-14614
04/27/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-16054
05/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days.18-16635
05/11/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-18133
05/14/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-39 (Via FTP).18-18218
05/14/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Vols. 40-49 (Via FTP).18-18234
05/17/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 4481-4600, 4601-4782, 4784-4800, 4801-4864, 5824-5853, 7390-7400, 7401-7484, 7519-7526, 7546-7551, 7884-7979, 9037-9041, 9074-9135, 9140-9141, 9243-9302, 9560-9563 (SEALED).
07/05/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/15/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal in Part and Affirming in Part. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED in part and the district court's order AFFIRMED in part." SNP18-MC/RP/LS (SC)18-904412
12/11/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)18-907952
12/11/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/31/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 14, 2018. (SC)18-907952