Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75596
Short Caption:MMAWC, LLC VS. ZION WOOD OBI WAN TR.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A764118Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Briefing Completed/To Screening
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/19/2018 / Young, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/17/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
04/17/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-14638
04/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-14640
04/18/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Christopher Childs, Chtd. Check no. 0349.
04/18/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Appellant counsel is now with Kennedy & Couvillier, PLLC)18-14893
04/19/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Young.18-15192
05/02/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-16734
05/02/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's NRAP 44 & NRS 30.130 Notice of Appeal Involving Constitutional Questions.18-16735
05/03/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Certification. The clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court certifies to the Honorable Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General of the State of Nevada, that on May 2, 2018, appellants filed with the Supreme Court a notice that this appeal draws into question the constitutionality of NRS 597.995. See NRAP 44.18-16923
05/15/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-18540
05/17/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-18808
05/30/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/21/18. To Court Reporter: Brynn Griffiths.18-20591
06/29/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Brynn Griffiths stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/21/18.18-24759
08/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 (part 1).18-31533
08/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 (part 2).18-31536
08/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 1 (part 3).18-31537
08/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 (part 1).18-31538
08/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol. 2 (part 2).18-31539
08/15/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.18-31544
08/15/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.18-31561
09/11/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 28, 2018.18-35500
10/01/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-38227
10/30/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 14, 2018.18-42449
11/13/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. (SC)18-903880
11/13/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)