Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75662
Short Caption:STATE VS. INZUNZA (RIGOBERTO)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C321860Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/19/2019 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:07/19/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/25/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
04/25/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-15797
05/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.18-20598
06/04/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.18-21156
06/04/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-21178
08/23/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Opening Brief).18-33037
08/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: September 24, 2018.18-33044
09/24/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-37279
09/24/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-37281
10/24/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Respondent's Answering Brief.18-41802
10/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 26, 2018.18-41806
11/27/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (SC)18-905659
12/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: December 10, 2018. (SC)18-907282
12/11/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)18-908076
12/11/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-908104
01/10/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-01574
01/10/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
01/22/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-03147
01/25/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike. (SC)19-03986
03/15/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondent has filed a motion to strike appellant's reply brief. This court denies the motion. (SC).19-11713
06/03/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, July 19, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-23989
07/08/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-28913
07/19/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
12/26/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 69. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-52125
01/21/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-02735
01/21/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)