Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75675
Short Caption:HENRY (JENNIFER) VS. NEV. COMM'N ON JUDICIAL DISCIPLINECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/28/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/27/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Daniel Marks.
04/27/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition.18-16068
04/27/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ.18-16069
05/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file any reply.18-19054
05/18/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for Stay Emergency Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e).18-19175
05/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Temporary Stay. Petitioner has moved to stay the Commission's upcoming public hearing pending our consideration of the petition. We stay the judicial discipline proceedings against petition in Case No. 2016-142-P, including the hearing scheduled for May 29, 2018, pending further order of this court. Respondent's Response to the Motion for Stay due: May 24, 2018.18-19270
05/22/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Opposition to Emergency Motion For Stay Under NRAP 27(e).18-19575
05/24/2018MotionFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Stay Under NRAP 27(e).18-19881
05/24/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Stay. We grant petitioner's motion for stay of the judicial discipline proceedings against her in Case No. 2016-142-P, pending further order of this court.18-19984
06/05/2018Petition/WritFiled Respondent's Answering Brief to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.18-21283
06/19/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition of Prohibition.18-23323
06/19/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Appendix to Petition for Writ of Prohibition.18-23324
11/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)18-906091
02/28/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition denied." Fn1[The Honorable Elissa F. Cadish and the Honorable Abbi Silver did not participate in the decision of this matter.] Fn2[In light of this opinion, we vacate the stay of proceedings entered on May 24, 2018.] Before the Court En Banc. Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 5. EN BANC (SC)19-09140
02/28/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address for Thomas C. Bradley, Esq. (SC)19-09242