Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75692
Short Caption:TMX, INC. VS. VOLK C/W 74813Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:74813*, 75692Related Case(s):65807, 65807-COA, 66222, 66222-COA, 74813
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1302719Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/19/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/30/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Charles R. Kozak. Check no. 2677.
04/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-16325
04/30/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-16329
04/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.18-16337
05/01/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:18-16423
05/02/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Consolidate this Appeal with Case No. 74813. Nos. 74813/75692.18-16627
05/04/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Non-Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Consolidate this Appeal with Case No. 74813. Nos. 74813/75692.18-17071
05/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals and Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 6, 2018. Nos. 74813/75692.18-17577
05/30/2018MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel (Myron Moskovitz for Appellants). Nos. 74813/75692.18-20578
05/30/2018MotionFiled Motion to Associate Counsel (Christopher Hu for Appellants). Nos. 74813/75692.18-20580
06/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21484
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21487
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21488
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 3. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21489
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 4. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21490
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 5. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21491
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 6. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21492
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 7. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21493
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 8. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21494
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 9. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21495
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 10. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21496
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 11. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21497
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 12. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21499
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 13. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21500
06/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Errata to Opening Brief. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21604
06/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Associate Counsel. Attorneys Myron Moskovitz and Christopher Hu of the law firm of Moskovitz Appellate Team shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants in this matter. Nevada attorney Charles R. Kozak of the law firm Kozak & Associates, LLC, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Moskowitz and Mr. Hu in this matter. Nos. 74813/75692.18-21705
06/11/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Robert L. Eisenberg as counsel for Respondent).18-21965
06/26/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Her Answering Brief and Appendix (First Request). Nos. 74813/75692.18-24284
06/26/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 6, 2018. Nos. 74813/75692.18-24287
07/25/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time for Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 74813/75692.18-28489
08/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 20, 2018. Nos. 74813/75692.18-29607
08/17/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 74813/75692.18-32015
08/17/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 1. Nos. 74813/75692.18-32016
08/17/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief - Volume 2. Nos. 74813/75692.18-32018
09/12/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. No. 74813/75692.18-35658
09/12/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/07/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. The undersigned, Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, does not believe that her association with these other matters as a district judge constitutes a basis for disqualification and has no personal bias or prejudice concerning any party to this appeal. The undersigned makes this disclosure, however, so that any party who believes it is appropriate to request recusal may do so. Any recusal request should be made in writing within seven days of the filing date of this Voluntary Disclosure. Nos. 74813/75692. (SC)19-05906
04/08/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Voluntary Recusal
04/19/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Nos. 74813/75692. (SC).19-17368
05/06/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. Nos. 74813/75692. (SC)Y19-19782
05/06/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. Nos. 74813/75692. (REJECTED PER NOTICE ISSUED ON MAY 7, 2019). (SC)
05/07/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Rejection of Filed Document. Nos. 74813/75692. (SC)19-19912