Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75730
Short Caption:BHATIA, D.O. VS. DIST. CT. (BAXTER)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65064, 75178, 75335, 75374, 75427, 75429, 75432, 75849
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A687208Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Douglas for Justice GibbonsPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/02/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from John H. Cotton.
05/02/2018Petition/WritFiled Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) for a Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-16705
05/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-16708
05/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-16709
05/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-16712
05/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.18-16714
05/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.18-16715
05/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 6.18-16716
05/03/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Certificate of Service (Emergency Petition and Appendix Volume 1-6).18-16932
05/04/2018MotionFiled Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion for Leave to Join in the Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) for a Writ of Mandamus Filed on Behalf of Bhatia, Gordon, Jamison, and Inpatient Consultants.18-16991
05/04/2018MotionFiled Dignity Health d/b/a St. Rose Dominican Hospital - Siena Campus' Motion for Leave to Join in the Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27 (e) for a Writ of Mandamus Filed on Behalf of Shalini Bhatia, D.O.18-17036
05/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Entry of Written Order and Expedited Answer. Real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have until 4 p.m. on Monday, May 7, 2018, to file and serve an answer, and to provide to this court a copy of the aforementioned written district court order on motion in limine no. 1. No extensions of time will be granted. fn1[Defendants Scott Selco, M.D.'s and Dignity Health's May 4, 2018, motions for leave to join this emergency writ petition as petitioners are granted; the clerk of this court shall modify the caption on the docket for this case to conform with the caption of this order.] fn2[All documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.]18-17075
05/04/2018MotionFiled Brian Lipman M.D.'S Motion For Leave To Join In The Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(E) For Writ Of Mandamus Filed On Behalf Of Shalini Bhatia, D.O., Jessica Gordon D.O., Nerie Jamison, Dnp And Inpatient Consultant of Nevada Inc.18-17132
05/04/2018MotionFiled Petitioner Scott M. Selco, M.D.'s Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Writ Proceeding.18-17161
05/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit of Service of Scott Selco, M.D.'s Motion for Leave to Join in the Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus.18-17162
05/07/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner Dignity Health's Motion for Leave to Join in the Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) For Stay of Trial Pending Resolution of Writ Proceeding.18-17167
05/07/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motions in Limine. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 5/7/18.18-17170
05/07/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Letter. (The Supreme Court is Currently Reviewing Issues in this Case to Determine Whether or Not An Emergency Stay is Appropriate in this Matter).18-17237
05/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Expedited Reply. Petitioners shall have until 1:00 p.m. on Tuesday, May 8, 2018, to file and serve a reply to the answer, including authorities. No extensions of time will be granted. fn1[Defendant Brian Lipman, M.D.'s May 4, 2018, motion for leave to join this emergency writ petition as a petitioner is granted; the clerk of this court shall modify the caption on the docket for this case to conform with the caption of this order.] fn2[Documents shall be filed personally or by facsimile or electronic transmission with the clerk of this court in Carson City.] fn3[We defer ruling on the May 4, 2018, motion for a stay, and the May 7, 2018, motion for leave to file a joinder thereto.]18-17255
05/07/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Party' Answer To Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) For A Writ Of Mandamus Or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-17343
05/07/2018MotionFiled Syed Akbarullah, M.D.'s Motion for Leave to Join the Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27 (e) For Writ of Mandamus.18-17344
05/07/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Letter from Thomas Doyle. (Correspondence to Nevada Supreme Court re Proposed Order - Dr. Syed Akbarullah).18-17358
05/08/2018AppendixFiled Appendix (Real Party's Answer To Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) For A Writ Of Mandamus Or Other Extraordinary Relief).18-17365
05/08/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Letter - Correspondence from Peter S. Christiansen.18-17372
05/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Real Party's Answer To Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) For A Writ Of Mandamus Or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-17430
05/08/2018Petition/WritFiled Expedited Reply on Behalf of Scott Selco, MD, in Support of Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) for a Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-17481
05/08/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner Shalini Bhatia, D.O.'s Expedited Reply In Support of Emergency Petition Under NRAP 27(e) for a Writ of Mandamus or Other Extraordinary Relief.18-17482
05/08/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner Dignity Health d/b/a St. Rose Dominican Hospital - Siena Campus' Reply to the Real Party in Interest's Answer.18-17483
05/08/2018AppendixFiled Petitioner Shalini Bhatia, D.O.'s Appendix.18-17484
05/09/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. The clerk of this court shall modify the caption of this docket to conform with the caption of this order including Syed Akbarullah, M.D. as a petitioner. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to vacate its May 1 and 7 orders ruling on motions in limine no. 1 and 24. The motion for stay and joinder thereto, filed in this case on May 4 and May 7, 2018, respectively, are denied as moot."18-17690
05/09/2018WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and two copies of order mailed to Attorney John H. Cotton for service upon Judge David M. Jones.18-17727
05/18/2018WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge David M. Jones on May 14, 2018.18-19026
06/04/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-21064
06/04/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.