Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75743
Short Caption:CITY OF MESQUITE VS. DIST. CT. (SMAELLIE)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A759770Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Writ Issued
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/28/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/2018Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Charity F. Felts.
05/04/2018Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.18-17041
05/04/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.18-17043
05/04/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.18-17044
05/04/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.18-17045
05/15/2018BriefFiled Brief of Amici Clark County, Douglas County, Humboldt County, Lyon County, City of Sparks, Truckee Meadows Water Authority, Lincoln County School District, Lander County School District, Humboldt County School District, Carson City School District and Eureka County School District in Support of Petitioner.18-18399
06/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer. Answer to Petition for Writ due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file any reply.18-22855
07/05/2018Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.18-25498
07/20/2018Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.18-27742
11/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC)18-906090
02/26/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Petitioner shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve a supplemental brief. Real party in interest shall have 15 days from service of petitioner's supplemental brief to file and serve a supplemental answering brief. The supplemental briefs shall comply with the page and type-volume limitations in NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). (SC)19-08866
03/01/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Supplemental Briefing Deadlines. (SC)19-09528
03/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Real party in interest shall have until May 13, 2019, to file and serve the supplemental answering brief. The supplemental briefs shall comply with the page and type-volume limitations in NRAP 32(a)(7)(A). (SC)19-09850
04/12/2019BriefFiled Petitioner's Supplemental Brief. (SC).19-16192
05/07/2019BriefFiled Real Party in Interest's Supplemental Answering Brief. (SC)19-20072
08/01/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition granted." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty. Majority: Gibbons, C.J., Hardesty/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 33. (SC)19-32347
08/01/2019WritIssued Writ with letter. Original and one copy of writ and copy of the order mailed to Attorney Charity Felts for service upon Judge Gloria Sturman. (SC).19-32496
08/07/2019WritFiled Returned Writ. Original Writ returned. Served on Judge Gloria Sturman on August 5, 2019. (SC)19-33234