Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75769
Short Caption:AMAYA VS. GUERRERO RIVERA (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D562584Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/28/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs
Expedited

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
05/08/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-17393
05/08/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-17395
05/08/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries (SEALED).
05/14/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on 05/08/18. Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.18-18307
05/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee.18-18368
05/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines/Child Custody. Transcript request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement & Appendix due: 40 days.18-18633
05/16/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-18789
06/26/2018Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Fast Track Statement.18-24361
06/26/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement.18-24366
08/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Fast Track Response. Respondent's Fast Track Response due: 20 days.18-33558
10/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, respondent has not filed the fast track response or otherwise communicated with this court. Accordingly, this appeal will be decided without a fast track response.18-39898
10/11/2018Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
03/28/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-13776
07/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and Remanded". Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Hardesty. Silver, J. dissenting. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 27. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-28444