Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75777
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (MATTHEW) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):65998, 75777-COA, 78597
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C294695Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/22/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/08/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/08/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-17487
05/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.18-18617
05/31/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-10 (Via FTP).18-20640
06/06/2018Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Pre-Sentence Investigation Report pages 817 to 827 (SEALED).
07/03/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-25243
08/22/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
10/12/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals.18-40090
03/14/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-JT/MG/BB (SC)
04/09/2019Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals. (SC)
04/09/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-15395
04/09/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
04/23/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 12, 2019. (SC)19-15395