Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75783
Short Caption:SPAR BUS. SERV.'S, INC. VS. OLSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A755501Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/10/2018 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/29/2019How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/09/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Bongiovi Law Firm, LLC. Check no. 654.
05/09/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)18-17653
05/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.18-17655
05/10/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.18-17921
05/22/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.18-19629
06/07/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.18-21791
06/11/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.18-21971
06/21/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Carrie Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: no dates given.18-23802
06/26/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/10/17. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen.18-24405
07/10/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Recorder. Carrie Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. 10/10/17.18-26189
08/30/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 24, 2018.18-34068
09/24/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-37259
09/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-37262
10/24/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 7, 2018.18-41831
11/08/2018BriefFiled Respondent ESD's Answering Brief. (SC)18-903416
11/08/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix Volume 1. (SC)18-903417
12/10/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-907839
12/10/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/23/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. My sister-in-law, Rosa Mendez, is the Public Information Officer with the Division of Employment Training and Rehabilitation Division. I believe that I can be fair and impartial in this matter, but I am making this disclosure so that the parties may file any objection they may have to my participation in this matter. The parties will have 10 days from the date of this order to file any objection based on my disclosure. (SC).19-17760
05/02/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Appellant's Non-Opposition to Notice of Voluntary Disclosure. (SC)19-19217
05/29/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Change of Attorney of Record for The Employment Security Division of the Nevada Department of Employment, Training & Rehabilitation. (SC)19-23238
05/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).19-23332
09/05/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed" Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 40. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-37107