Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75825
Short Caption:LANGFORD (JUSTIN) VS. STATE C/W 76075Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:75825*, 76075Related Case(s):70536, 74856, 74856-COA, 76075, 77262
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C296556Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/07/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/14/2018Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/14/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-18351
05/14/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA). (TRANSFERRED TO NEW APPEAL-DOCKET NO. 76075 PER ORDER 6/13/18
05/24/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.18-19930
05/30/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Brief with Exhibits Attached. (DETACHED EXHIBITS AND RETURNED UNFILED PER 07/13/18 ORDER.)18-20596
05/31/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief (Opening Brief).18-20796
06/04/2018Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Modify and/or Correct Illegal Sentence and "Judicial Notice of Lack of Jurisdiction." Filed in district court on 6/1/18. (In response to order filed 5/24/18). (DETACHED ORDER DENYING MOTION TO MODIFY AND/OR CORRECT ILLEGAL SENTENCE AND FILED IN NEW APPEAL-DOCKET NO. 76075 PER ORDER FILED 6/13/18).18-21166
06/05/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Transcripts at State Expense. Nos. 75825/76075.18-21329
06/12/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proper Person Judicial Notice.18-22237
06/12/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Brief for Notice of Appeal No. 2. (TRANSFERRED TO NEW APPEAL-DOCKET NO. 76075 PER ORDER 6/13/18).
06/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On May 7, 2018, appellant filed two notices of appeal. we direct the clerk of this court to remove the second notice of appeal from the docket of this appeal and to docket it as a separate appeal. We further direct the clerk of this court to detach the order denying a motion to modify and/or correct illegal sentence from the documents filed in this appeal on June 4, 2018, and file it in the new appeal. The clerk of this court shall also file in the new appeal the pro se document filed in this appeal on June 5, 2018, and the clerk shall remove the "proper person appellant's brief for notice of appeal no. 2," filed in this appeal on June 12, 2018, and file it in the new appeal. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is denied as moot.18-22614
06/29/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Omnibus Motion.18-24756
07/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Consolidating Appeals, Regarding Motions, and Returning Exhibits. We consolidate these appeals for all appellate purposes. Appellant has filed motion for transcripts at state's expense. We decline to order the preparation of transcripts at this time. We take no action in regard to the judicial notice filed in Docket No. 75825. Appellant has also filed a pro se opening brief with exhibits in Docket No. 75825. We elect to construe the document as an informal brief. The clerk of this court shall detach the exhibits from the brief, and return them, unfiled. Nos. 75825/76075.18-26801
07/26/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion For Summary Reversal & Notice of Motion.18-28792
07/26/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Schedule For Hearing Pursuant to NRS 177.215.18-28799
08/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Appellant has filed an "omnibus motion" for bail or that his sentence be stayed and that he be released from custody. Appellant has also filed a motion to schedule a hearing on his appeal pursuant to NRS 177.215 and a motion for summary reversal of the orders denying his postconviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus and motion to modify his sentence. No cause appearing, the motions are denied. Nos. 76075/75825.18-30591
08/21/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to reconsider Motion to Schedule a Hearing Pursuant to NRS 177.215. Nos. 75825/76075.18-32534
08/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has file a motion asking this court to reconsider its previous order denying his motion to set a hearing in these appeals. Appellant's motion is denied. Nos. 75825/76075.18-33923
09/07/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. Nos. 75825/76075
09/17/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Summary Reversal. Nos. 75825/76075.18-36256
09/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for a summary reversal of his conviction because he has not received transcripts. The motion is denied. We remind appellant that at this stage of the proceedings, we are unable to determine which transcripts, if any, are necessary for this court's review on appeal, and therefore, we decline to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time. Nos. 75825/76075.18-37794
10/02/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Affidavit of Judicial Notice of Self-Executing Coloring Agreement Complete Indigent Filed Stamp Copy Required Pursuant to Gluth v Kangas." Nos. 75825/76075.18-38597
10/10/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to File Amended Appeal Brief. Nos. 75825/76075.18-39793
10/22/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an amended opening brief of no more than 30 pages addressing the issues in both appeals. Upon filing of the amended opening brief, the clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed May 30, 2018. Nos. 75825/76075.18-41431
10/24/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Application for Bail Pursuant to NRS 178.488 and 18 U.S.C. 3143." Nos. 75825/76075.18-41946
11/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion for bail pending appeal and for a stay of the execution of his sentence. The motion for bail or suspension of his sentence is denied. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).18-903299
11/08/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion - "Motion for Extension of Pages for Informal Brief". Nos. 75825/76075. (SC)18-903467
11/21/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Notice of Address Change. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC)18-905217
11/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motion. The clerk shall detach and return unfiled the exhibits attached to appellant's opening brief received on November 8, 2018, and shall file the brief separately. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).18-905405
11/26/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief Amended. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).18-905408
12/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Appellant's Judicial Notice. Nos. 75825/76075 (SC)18-907415
01/11/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Decision on Appeals. Nos.75825/76075. (SC)19-01787
01/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a motion for a decision on his appeals. The motion is granted to the following extent. The appeals will be resolved as expeditiously as the court's docket permits. Nos. 75825/76075/77262. (SC)19-02607
03/20/2019Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Omnibus Motion." Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).19-12468
03/29/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn4 [We have considered Langford's pending "Judicial Notice," "Affidavit of Judicial Notice of Self-Executing Coloring Agreement Complete Indigent Filed Stamp Copy Required Pursuant to Gluth v. Kangas," and "Omnibus Motion" and conclude that no relief is warranted.] NNP19-KP/RP/EC. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).19-13897
04/11/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC)19-15976
05/31/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).19-23697
06/03/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Appoint Counsel. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC).19-24062
06/14/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. Nos. 75825/76075. (SC)19-25778