Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 75890
Short Caption:SFR INV.'S POOL 1, LLC VS. NATIONSTAR MORTG. LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):69400
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A684715Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/22/2018Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
05/22/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.18-19517
05/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.18-19519
05/22/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.18-19521
05/22/2018Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacqueline A. Gilbert
05/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.18-19603
05/23/2018Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:18-19696
06/07/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-21765
06/12/2018Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.18-22272
09/19/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.18-36650
09/19/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Joint Appendix due: October 22, 2018.18-36652
10/22/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief and Joint Appendix (Second Request).18-41306
10/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 21, 2018.18-42009
11/26/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)18-905433
11/26/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 1. (SC)18-905434
11/26/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 2. (SC)18-905435
11/26/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 3. (SC)18-905438
11/26/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 4. (SC)18-905439
11/26/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume 5. (SC)18-905440
11/26/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Errata to Opening Brief and Certificate of Service Attached Thereto with Executed Certificate of Compliance. (SC)18-905456
11/26/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 27. (SC)18-905536
12/05/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal (First Request). (SC)18-907214
12/07/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Supplement the Record due: December 12, 2018. (SC).18-907467
12/12/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 9, 2019. (SC)18-908328
12/12/2018MotionFiled Respondent Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal (Second Request). (SC)18-908379
12/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Appellant's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal due: January 9, 2019. (SC).18-909199
01/03/2019MotionFiled Respondent Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Moton to Extend Time to File Response to SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal and to File Answering Brief (Third Request). (SC).19-00434
01/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have until February 8, 2019, to file and serve the opposition and the answering brief. (SC)19-01645
02/11/2019MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and for a Stay of Substantive Briefing. (SC)19-06263
02/13/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Errata to Docketing Statement. (SC)19-06788
02/14/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and to Stay Substantive Briefing. (SC)19-07001
02/21/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss and Motion for New Deadline to File Brief. (SC).19-08150
03/06/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondent has filed a notice of withdrawal of its motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction. Based on this notice, this court takes no action on the motion to dismiss filed on February 11, 2019. Respondent shall have until March 14, 2019, to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant has filed a motion to supplement the record on appeal. The motion is denied. The clerk shall reject the supplement received in E-flex on November 26, 2018. (SC)19-10107
03/15/2019BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief. (SC)19-11611
03/21/2019BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent and Affirmance of the District Court's Judgment. (SC)19-12666
04/15/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief (First Request). (SC)19-16339
04/15/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 15, 2019. (SC)19-16352
05/15/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)19-21529
05/16/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
10/24/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Vacating and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn3 [The Honorable Michael Douglas, Senior Justice, participated in the decision of this matter under general order of assignment.] MG/RP/MD. (SC).19-43961
11/18/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-47110
11/18/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
12/06/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 21, 2019. (SC)19-47110